Medtronic Vascular Inc. et al v. Advanced Cardiovascular Systems Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv01066
Filed: February 15, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2009 923 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 918 Stipulation allowing equipment in the courtroom filed by Medtronic USA Inc., Medtronic Vascular Galway Ltd., Medtronic Inc., Medtronic Vascular Inc.. Signed by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/17/09. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
July 14, 2009 894 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 7/14/2009. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 13, 2009 890 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 862 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Declaration of Dr. David Ku. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
July 9, 2009 886 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL RULES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/9/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
June 18, 2009 857 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 854 Stipulation filed by Abbott Vascular Inc., Abbott Cardiovascular Systems Inc., Abbott Laboratories. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/18/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
June 16, 2009 850 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Simplifying Issues for Trial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 06/16/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
May 21, 2009 804 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 773 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Supplemental Report of Dr. Eberhart on Infringement. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2009)
May 19, 2009 783 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE AND ORDER - Settlement Conference continued to 6/17/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/19/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
May 15, 2009 782 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 718 722 Summary Judgment in Part and Denying Summary Judgment in Part (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 1, 2009 772 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 771 Stipulation filed by Abbott Vascular Inc., Abbott Cardiovascular Systems Inc., Abbott Laboratories. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/1/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 20, 2009 769 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 5/21/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/20/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
March 18, 2009 740 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 729 Second Motion for Leave to Seek Reconsideration (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 16, 2009 737 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/16/2009. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 6, 2009 728 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME re 714 Stipulation, filed by Medtronic USA Inc., Medtronic Vascular Galway Ltd., Medtronic Inc., Medtronic Vascular Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/6/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
February 24, 2009 713 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 663 Motion for Leave to Seek Reconsideration (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 6, 2009 583 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice of Correction. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 2/6/2009. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
January 30, 2009 581 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 580 Stipulation filed by Medtronic USA Inc., Medtronic Vascular Galway Ltd., Medtronic Inc., Medtronic Vascular Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/30/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
November 19, 2008 569 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Further Meet and Confer Re 554 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/19/2008. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
November 5, 2008 558 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 557 Stipulation filed by Medtronic USA Inc., Medtronic Vascular Galway Ltd., Medtronic Inc., Medtronic Vascular Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/5/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
October 22, 2008 550 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING FORTH SCHEDULE re 546 Stipulation filed by Medtronic USA Inc., Medtronic Vascular Galway Ltd., Medtronic Inc., Medtronic Vascular Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/22/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 15, 2008 547 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 432 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Robert Eberhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/15/2008. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
September 17, 2008 536 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 483 Stipulation, filed by Abbott Vascular Inc., Abbott Cardiovascular Systems Inc., Abbott Laboratories. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/17/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
September 16, 2008 530 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER ALLOWING EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM re 526 Stipulation filed by Abbott Vascular Inc., Abbott Cardiovascular Systems Inc., Abbott Laboratories. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/16/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
September 9, 2008 512 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part 487 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 4, 2008 507 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/4/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medtronic Vascular Inc. et al v. Advanced Cardiovascular Systems Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?