Sun Microsystems Inc., v. Hynix Semiconductor Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv01665
Filed: March 2, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2010 754 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/11/2010. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
July 14, 2009 751 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR INC. AND HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR AMERICA, INC. re 749 Stipulation filed by Sun Microsystems Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/14/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
May 27, 2009 720 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES FOR SUN REPLY BRIEFS AND HYNIX OPPOSITION BRIEF re 715 Stipulation filed by Sun Microsystems Inc.,. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/27/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
May 20, 2009 710 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/20/2009. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
May 11, 2009 701 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton 519 640 Motion to Seal on Limited Grounds (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
May 7, 2009 698 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING SUN'S STATE LAW CLAIMS BASED ON FOREIGN PURCHASES OF DRAM AND RESOLVING MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF FOREIGN PURCHASES OF DRAM re 693 Stipulation,,,,,,, filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/7/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
May 6, 2009 690 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL RULES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/6/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
May 5, 2009 688 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING HYNIX'S REQUEST TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT LIST re 678 Stipulation, filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/5/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
May 4, 2009 683 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Hearing Date and Advancing Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/4/2009. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
April 15, 2009 614 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Plaintiff's Pending Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/15/2009. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009)
April 6, 2009 592 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE of Deficiency re Pretrial Filings. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/6/2009. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
April 3, 2009 589 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Denying 371 372 Motions for Summary Judgment (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
April 1, 2009 582 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 6/15/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/1/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
March 31, 2009 548 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting Motion to Dismiss; Denying Motion to Exclude; and Granting Summary Judgment in Part and Denying Summary Judgment in Part 382 384 387 394 434 (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 24, 2009 547 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS ELPIDA MEMORY, INC. AND ELPIDA MEMORY (USA) re 538 Stipulation, filed by Elpida Memory (USA) Inc., Elpida Memory Inc., Elpida Memory (USA) Inc. and Elpida Memory Inc., terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/24/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
December 12, 2008 499 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 497 Letter filed by Elpida Memory (USA) Inc., Elpida Memory Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/12/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
November 17, 2008 476 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE and ORDER Continuing Hearing Dates. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/17/2008. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
October 29, 2008 439 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' FILING OF CERTAIN DEPOSITION EXCERPTS AND EXHIBITS AND PAGE LENGTH OF NANYA TECHNOLOGY CORP. AND NANYA TECHNOLOGY CORP. USA SUMMARY JUDGMENT REPLY BRIEFS re (263 in 3:07-cv-01200-PJH) Stipulation, file d by Nanya Technology Corporation, Nanya Technology Corporation USA, (271 in 3:07-cv-01212-PJH) Stipulation, filed by Nanya Technology Corporation, Nanya Technology Corporation USA, (438 in 3:06-cv-01665-PJH) Stipulation, filed by Nanya Technology Co rporation, Nanya Technology Corporation, USA, (297 in 3:06-cv-02915-PJH) Stipulation, filed by Nanya Technology Corporation, Nanya Technology Corporation, USA, (250 in 3:07-cv-01207-PJH) Stipulation, filed by Nanya Technology Corporation, Nanya Technology Corporation, USA, (367 in 3:07-cv-01381-PJH) Stipulation, filed by Nanya Technology Corporation, Nanya Technology Corporation USA. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/29/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
September 23, 2008 407 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURE FOR FILING PLAINTIFFS' BRIEFS AND DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEFS re (274 in 3:06-cv-02915-PJH) Stipulation, (246 in 3:07-cv-01212-PJH) Stipulation, (336 in 3:07-cv-01381-PJH) Stipulation, (229 in 3:07-cv-01207-PJH) Stipulation, (240 in 3:07-cv-01200-PJH) (406 in 3:06-cv-01665-PJH) Stipulation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/23/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 19, 2008 405 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PAGE LIMIT FOR JOINT OPPOSITION TO NANYA DEFENDANTS' SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS re (243 in 3:07-cv-01212-PJH) Stipulation filed by JACO Electronics, Inc, (333 in 3:07-cv-01381-PJH) Stipulation filed by Dram Claims L iquidation Trust, (237 in 3:07-cv-01200-PJH) Stipulation filed by All American Semiconductor, Inc., (403 in 3:06-cv-01665-PJH) Stipulation filed by Sun Microsystems Inc.,, (226 in 3:07-cv-01207-PJH) Stipulation filed by Edge Electronics, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/19/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 15, 2008 402 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE SUN PURCHASE DATA re 401 Stipulation, filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/15/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sun Microsystems Inc., v. Hynix Semiconductor Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?