H. et al v. Berkeley Unified School District et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02031
Filed: March 16, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 20:1400 Civil Rights of Handicapped Child
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2010 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. It is ORDERED that case numbers C06-2031 and C07-1712 are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/23/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
November 6, 2009 212 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF CDE DEFENDANTS re doc 210 filed by Bruno H. Defendants California Dept of Education and Jack O'Connell are hereby dismissed with prejudice from this action. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 11/6/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 4, 2009 211 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER FOR MINOR'S COMPROMISE. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 11/4/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
August 21, 2009 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that fees and expenses of the Special Master shall be paid from settlement funds. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
March 23, 2009 190 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 191 Motion to remove documents from public viewing. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009) Modified on 3/26/2009 (slh, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2009 184 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Settlement Conference set for 3/5/2009 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/30/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 15, 2009 181 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Settlement Conference set for 1/29/2009 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/14/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 12, 2009 179 Opinion or Order of the Court RECUSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/12/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 6, 2009 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 177 Letter filed by Jack O'Connell, California Department of Education for extention of time to file confidential settlement conference statement. Confidential settlement conference statement shall be hand delivered to Judge Spero's chambers by Noon on Jan. 9, 2009. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/06/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
December 31, 2008 176 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 1/14/2009 at 09:30 AM before Judge Joseph C. Spero, Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco, CA. Confidential settlement conference statements due to Judge Spero's chambers 7 days prior to the settlement conference. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/31/08. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2008)
December 15, 2008 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 161 continuing dispositive motion hearing cut-off and pre-trial conference. Stipulation filed by Jack O'Connell, California Department of Education. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
November 5, 2008 160 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 11/5/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
October 22, 2008 159 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re [doc #158]. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10/22/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
September 29, 2008 157 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 146 filed by Jack O'Connell, California Department of Education. Dispositive motion hearing cutoff is continued from 10/16/2008 to 1/29/2009 and the pretrial conference continued from 12/11/2008 to 3/26/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/29/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H. et al v. Berkeley Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?