Nakagawa v. The Regents of the University of California et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02066
Filed: March 20, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2008 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Within 90 days from the date hereof, that settlement has not in fact occurred, the foregoing order shall be vacated and this causes shall worthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Illston on 10/9/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
September 10, 2008 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Notice and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference. Further Settlement Conference set for 10/21/2008 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/10/2008. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 4, 2008 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adjusting litigation schedule. Signed by Judge Illston on 9/3/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
September 2, 2008 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Notice of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order. Settlement Conference set for 9/9/2008 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/2/2008. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nakagawa v. The Regents of the University of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?