Waterbury et al. v. Safeway Inc.

Case Number: 3:2006cv02072
Filed: March 20, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 62 Proposed Order filed by Lachlan Waterbury. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/12/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
December 16, 2008 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 57 Case Management Statement filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/16/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
October 27, 2008 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 52 Stipulation filed by Lachlan Waterbury. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/27/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waterbury et al. v. Safeway Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?