Grocery Outlet Inc. v. Albertson's, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02173
Filed: March 27, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2009 408 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING AND BRIEFING DEADLINES ON 388 MOTION for Attorney Fees American Stores Company, LLC, New Albertsons, Inc., and Albertsons LLCs Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees Pursuant to 15 U.S.C . § 1117(a); MOTION for Attorney Fees American Stores Company, LLC, New Albertsons, Inc., and Albertsons LLCs Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 1117(a); 391 First MOTION for Attorney Fees. Replies due by 3/13/2009. Motion Hearing previously set for 3/13/9 at 9:30 AM has been continued to 4/3/2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 02/23/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
January 15, 2009 399 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 398 Stipulation for Entry of Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/15/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 7, 2009 397 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE, TIME AND PLACE OF HEARING, AND ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES RE: 391 First MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Save Mart Supermarkets, 388 MOTION for Attorney Fees American Stores Company, LLC, New Alb ertsons, Inc., and Albertsons LLCs Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 1117(a); Memorandum of Points and Authorities MOTION for Attorney Fees American Stores Company, LLC, New Albertsons, Inc., and Albertsons LLCs Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 1117(a); Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Albertson's LLC, American Stores Company, LLC, New Albertson's, Inc., Set/Re set Deadlines as to 391 First MOTION for Attorney Fees, 388 MOTION for Attorney Fees American Stores Company, LLC, New Albertsons, Inc., and Albertsons LLCs Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 1 117(a); Memorandum of Points and Authorities MOTION for Attorney Fees American Stores Company, LLC, New Albertsons, Inc., and Albertsons LLCs Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 1117(a); Memoran dum of Points and Authorities. Oppositions due by 2/6/2009. Replies due by 2/20/2009. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 01/07/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
January 5, 2009 395 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 386 MOTION for Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/5/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
December 17, 2008 382 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended ORDER Granting Summary Judgment (with Proper Defendants Named). Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 17, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 16, 2008 380 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 347 Motion for Summary Judgment. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
December 11, 2008 378 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 11, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
December 3, 2008 377 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 376 Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 3, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
October 29, 2008 374 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DISCOVERY re 373 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Discovery. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/29/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 8, 2008 364 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 363 Stipulation To Modify Pre-Trial Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S.White on 10/8/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
September 26, 2008 346 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/26/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 25, 2008 333 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 332 Defendants' and Counter-Claimants' Administrative Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/25/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
February 1, 2008 305 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 304 Stipulation to Refer Case to Magistrate Zimmerman for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 1, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)
April 14, 2006 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 33 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2006)
April 12, 2006 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 31 Substitution of Counsel for Defendants. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/12/06. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2006)
April 7, 2006 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 29 Motion to Continue and Setting Hearing Date on Motion for Preliminary Injunction for June 30, 2006. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2006)
April 4, 2006 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 18 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by Grocery Outlet Inc.,. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/4/06. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2006)
April 3, 2006 17 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS re 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 3, 2006. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grocery Outlet Inc. v. Albertson's, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?