Campbell v. Henry

Case Number: 3:2006cv02225
Filed: March 28, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/3/2015. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
October 16, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granted 91 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Status Conference filed by Valerie E. Campbell. Status Conference reset for 11/7/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer, Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/16/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
January 13, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Traverse filed by Valerie E. Campbell. Extension to and including 4/3/2014 in which to file a taverse. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/10/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 9, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 74 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Valerie E. Campbell. Traverse due by 4/8/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/9/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
October 3, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 72 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Traverse filed by Valerie E. Campbell. Traverse due by 1/7/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/3/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
July 9, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 70 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Traverse filed by Valerie E. Campbell. Traverse due by 10/1/2012. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/9/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
March 20, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Traverse filed by Valerie E. Campbell. Traverse due by 5/4/2012.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/19/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
September 8, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 59 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; Reply due by 11/7/2011. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
July 19, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting extension of time to file a traverse re 57 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Valerie E. Campbell. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/18/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 7, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/7/2011. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
October 4, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REINSTATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/4/2010. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
September 22, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING CJA ATTORNEY FOR 06-2225. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 09/22/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?