Netflix, Inc. v. Blockbuster, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Netflix, Inc.
Defendant: Blockbuster, Inc.
Counter-claimant: Blockbuster, Inc.
Counter-defendant: Netflix, Inc.
Movant: Dennis Dilbeck
Case Number: 3:2006cv02361
Filed: April 4, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2007 240 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 26, 2007. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2007)
June 18, 2007 236
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Blockbuster, Inc. re [233] MOTION for Summary Judgment, [235] Declaration in Support, [234] Declaration in Support (Confidential Versions - Filed Under Seal) (Taclas, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/18/2007)
June 15, 2007 232
NOTICE by Blockbuster, Inc. of Errata to Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Blockbuster's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Non-Infringement (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 6/15/2007)
June 8, 2007 225 Opinion or Order of the Court
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 7/27/2007 09:30 AM.Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/7/07. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2007)
June 1, 2007 223 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER SETTING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 1, 2007. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2007)
May 31, 2007 221
Letter from Mary T. Huser re hearing date and briefing schedule for summary judgment motions. (Huser, Mary) (Filed on 5/31/2007)
May 29, 2007 219
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Blockbuster, Inc. of Reply to Rebuttal Reports of Tom Adams and Haim Mendelson by Jason Salzetti (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 5/29/2007)
May 22, 2007 214 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER, by Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed on 5/21/7, granting 212 Motion to File Under Seal For Netflix's Opposition to Blockbuster's Motion for Protective Order, Exhbiits to Paige Declaration - Exhs F, G,H and I. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2007)
May 21, 2007 213
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [215] [216] by Netflix, Inc. (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 5/21/2007) Modified on 5/22/2007 (sis, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2007 209
REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (9/17/2007) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (8/20/2007). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/17/2007. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2007)
May 14, 2007 207 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Alsup granting 206 Motion to Extend Expert Report Deadline One Week (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2007)
May 11, 2007 206
MOTION to Amend/Correct to Extend Expert Report Deadline One Week Because of Unexpected Surgery filed by Blockbuster, Inc.. (Taclas, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/11/2007)
May 7, 2007 205 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER SETTING PAGE LIMITS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 7, 2007. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2007)
May 1, 2007 201
REQUEST FOR INPUT ON PAGE LIMITS. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 1, 2007. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2007)
April 30, 2007 200
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [Netflix's Case-Management Memorandum] filed by Netflix, Inc.. (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 4/30/2007)
April 26, 2007 197
STIPULATION and Agreement Regarding Antitrust Claims and Discovery Disputes by Blockbuster, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Blockbuster, Inc.. (O'Brien, William) (Filed on 4/26/2007)
April 25, 2007 193
STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION OF BAKER BOTTS, LLP by Netflix, Inc.. (Paige, Eugene) (Filed on 4/25/2007)
April 23, 2007 192 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S REDACTION OF BOARD MINUTES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 04/23/7. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2007)
April 20, 2007 190
REQUEST RE CASE MANAGEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 20, 2007. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2007)
April 19, 2007 189
Minute Entry: Further Status Conference Conference held on 4/19/7 before Mag. Judge Joseph C. Spero. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/19/2007)
April 18, 2007 188 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE Re: Issues surrounding Blockbuster's reliance on the advice of counsel. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 04/18/07. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 17, 2007 187
STIPULATION And [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing Schedule by Netflix, Inc.. (Paige, Eugene) (Filed on 4/17/2007)
April 16, 2007 186
Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 4/16/2007 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/16/2007). Discovery dispute is referred to Magistrate Judge Spero. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2007)
April 13, 2007 183
Letter from Donn P. Pickett. (Taclas, Adrienne) (Filed on 4/13/2007)
April 12, 2007 181
AMENDED NOTICE SETTING HEARING RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/12/2007. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2007)
April 9, 2007 176
Letter from Daralyn J. Durie. (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 4/9/2007)
April 4, 2007 174
*** FILED IN ERROR. DUPLICATE OF DOCKET #172. ***
MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff Netflix's Notice Of Motion And Motion Under Civil L.R. 7-11 For Relief From April 12, 2007 Discovery Motion Deadline filed by Netflix, Inc.. (Paige, Eugene) (Filed on 4/4/2007) Modified on 4/4/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2007 173 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Alsup granting 172 Motion For Relief From Discovery Motion Deadline (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2007)
April 2, 2007 171
Minute Entry: Further TelephonicStatus Conference held on 4/2/7 before Mag. Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further telephonic status conference set for 4/6/7 at 2:30 PM (Date Filed: 4/2/2007). (Court Reporter Kathy Powell.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/2/2007)
March 26, 2007 168
Minute Entry: Further Status Conference held on 3/26/2007 before Mag. Judge Joseph C. Spero. A further status conference re: production of recovered documents is specially set for 4/2/7 at 8:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/26/2007)
March 20, 2007 167
Minute Entry: TelephonicStatus Conference re: Kroll progress held on 3/20/7 at 1:30 PM before Judge Spero. A further telephonic status conference is set for 3/26/7 at 2;00 PM. (Date Filed: 3/20/2007). (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/20/2007)
March 15, 2007 166 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER, by Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed on 3/15/7,granting in part and denying in part as moot 157 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery/Compel Production of Documents from Blockbuster. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2007)
March 14, 2007 165 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 14, 2007. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2007)
March 13, 2007 164
Proposed Order re 163 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Deposition of Marc Randolph) by Blockbuster, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Blockbuster, Inc.. (O'Brien, William) (Filed on 3/13/2007)
March 12, 2007 161 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Alsup granting 158 Motion for Relief from March 13, 2007 Deadline (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2007)
March 9, 2007 159
Proposed Order 158 On Plaintiff Netflix's Notice Of Motion And Motion Under Civil L.R. 7-11 For Relief From March 13, 2007 Deadline In Case Management Order by Netflix, Inc.. (Paige, Eugene) (Filed on 3/9/2007) Modified on 3/12/2007 (sis, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2007 157
Final MOTION for Discovery PLAINTIFF NETFLIX, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM BLOCKBUSTER filed by Netflix, Inc.. (Paige, Eugene) (Filed on 3/5/2007)
March 2, 2007 156
Proposed Order On Netflix's Motion To Compel The Production Of Documents From Blockbuster, Inc. by Netflix, Inc.. (Paige, Eugene) (Filed on 3/2/2007)
February 23, 2007 153 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RELATING CASE to C07-0643PVT by Judge William Alsup granting 143 Motion to Relate Case (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2007)
February 20, 2007 152 Opinion or Order of the Court
CLAIM-CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 20, 2007. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2007)
February 14, 2007 151
Reply Memorandum Blockbuster's Reply to Netflix's Critique of the Court's Tentative Claim Construction Order filed byBlockbuster, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Blockbuster, Inc.. (O'Brien, William) (Filed on 2/14/2007)
February 13, 2007 148
RESPONSE to NETFLIX'S CRITIQUE OF THE COURT'S TENTATIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER by Netflix, Inc.. (Paige, Eugene) (Filed on 2/13/2007)
February 12, 2007 146
Proposed Order RE Dennis Dilbeck's Administrative Motion by Blockbuster, Inc.. (Thomas, Dominique) (Filed on 2/12/2007)
February 9, 2007 144 Opinion or Order of the Court
TENTATIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 9, 2007. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2007)
January 31, 2007 142
Minute Entry: Claims Construction Hearing held on 1/31/2007 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 1/31/2007). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/31/2007)
January 29, 2007 140 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST REGARDING COURTROOM EQUIPMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 29, 2007. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2007)
January 25, 2007 139
Proposed Order Joint Request and [Proposed] Order Regarding Courtroom Equipment for Claim Construction Hearing on January 31, 2007 by Blockbuster, Inc.. (Chen, Tony) (Filed on 1/25/2007)
January 24, 2007 136
STIPULATION FURTHER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Blockbuster, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Blockbuster, Inc.. (O'Brien, William) (Filed on 1/24/2007)
January 17, 2007 135
Minute Entry: Tutorial Hearing held on 1/17/2007 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 1/17/2007). Claims Construction Hearing set for 1/31/2007 01:30 PM. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/17/2007)
January 16, 2007 134 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST REGARDING COURTROOM EQUIPMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 16, 2007. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2007)
January 12, 2007 131
Proposed Order Request and [Proposed] Order Regarding Courtroom Equipment for Technology Tutorial on January 17, 2007 by Blockbuster, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Blockbuster, Inc.. (O'Brien, William) (Filed on 1/12/2007)
January 11, 2007 130 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE from Jan. 12, 2007 to Jan. 26, 2007 at 9:30 AM. Finalized stipulation or joint letter brief shall be due by Jan. 24, 2007. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on Jan. 11, 2007. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2007)
January 8, 2007 125 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO Jan. 10, 2007, to submit a stipulation resolving all remaining issues or a joint letter setting forth any remaining issues and parties' respective positions. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/8/7. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2007)
January 5, 2007 124
Letter from Counsel for Netflix and Blockbuster to Magistrate Judge Spero Regarding Pending Discovery Motions. (O'Brien, William) (Filed on 1/5/2007)
January 3, 2007 123 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Alsup granting 120 Motion to Seal Document And to Withdraw Document Filed Publicly (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2007)
January 2, 2007 122
NOTICE by Blockbuster, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Blockbuster, Inc. Notice of Change of Firm Name (O'Brien, William) (Filed on 1/2/2007)
December 29, 2006 121
Proposed Order re 120 MOTION to Seal Document 118 Declaration in Support,, Administrative Motion to File Document Under Seal and Withdraw Document Filed Publicly; Supporting Declaration by Blockbuster, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Blockbuster, Inc.. (O'Brien, William) (Filed on 12/29/2006)
December 27, 2006 119
Brief Blockbuster's Brief on Claim Construction filed byBlockbuster, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Blockbuster, Inc.. (O'Brien, William) (Filed on 12/27/2006)
December 21, 2006 117 Opinion or Order of the Court
CORRECTED STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/20/06. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2006)
December 19, 2006 114
NOTICE by Blockbuster, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Blockbuster, Inc. re 113 Stipulation NOTICE OF LODGING OF [CORRECTED] STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTES (O'Brien, William) (Filed on 12/19/2006)
December 15, 2006 111
STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Blockbuster, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Blockbuster, Inc.. (O'Brien, William) (Filed on 12/15/2006)
December 14, 2006 109
STIPULATION FOR ONE-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME FOR SUBMISSION OF STIPULATION REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Blockbuster, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Blockbuster, Inc.. (O'Brien, William) (Filed on 12/14/2006)
December 7, 2006 108
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/7/2006 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 12/7/2006) re 58 MOTION to Intervene filed by Dennis Dilbeck. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/7/2006)
December 6, 2006 99
Proposed Order re 98 MOTION to Seal Administrative Motion To File Under Seal And Ramani Declaration in Support [Proposed] Order To File Documents Under Seal For Netflix's Opening Claim-Construction Brief by Netflix, Inc.. (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 12/6/2006)
December 5, 2006 97
CLERK'S NOTICE THAT the hearing on the pending Discovery Motions, previously noticed for 1/12/7 at 9:00 AM, has been reset to THE SAME DAY at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco, before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2006)
November 28, 2006 96 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Alsup granting 95 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 95 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 94 Reply to Opposition (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2006)
November 21, 2006 93 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE FURTHER PROCEEDINGS ON PENDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Unless the parties have resolved all outstanding issues on the pending discovery motions before 12/8/6, the respective lead trial counsel for the parties shall hold a further in-person conference on those motions on Dec. 8, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. in Judge Spero's courtroom. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/21/06. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2006)
November 20, 2006 92
STIPULATION AND {PROPOSED] ORDER RE FURTHER PROCEEDINGS ON PENDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS by Blockbuster, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Blockbuster, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Blockbuster, Inc.. (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 11/20/2006)
November 16, 2006 91
Memorandum in Opposition re 58 MOTION to Intervene filed byBlockbuster, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Blockbuster, Inc.. (O'Brien, William) (Filed on 11/16/2006)
November 6, 2006 87
Letter from Marshall B. Grossman re further discovery conference. (O'Brien, William) (Filed on 11/6/2006)
November 3, 2006 81
MOTION to Compel Further Responses to RFPs filed by Blockbuster, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Blockbuster, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2006 09:30 AM. (O'Brien, William) (Filed on 11/3/2006)
October 27, 2006 67 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER WITHDRAWING DOCKET ENTRY #62. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 27, 2006. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2006)
October 26, 2006 66
STIPULATION re 62 Status Report, Stipulation Requesting Withdrawal of Docket Entry #62 by Netflix, Inc.. (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 10/26/2006)
October 25, 2006 65
CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Motion to Intervene by Dennis Dilbeck Hearing set for 12/7/2006 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2006)
October 24, 2006 64 Opinion or Order of the Court
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/23/6. ***NOTE: Please see additional language on page 8, line 6***(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2006)
October 23, 2006 63 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER CONTINUING HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 23, 2006. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2006)
October 11, 2006 59
Proposed Order re 58 MOTION to Intervene by Dennis Dilbeck. (Himmelfarb, Alan) (Filed on 10/11/2006)
October 5, 2006 57
Minute Entry: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 10/4/2006 before Joseph C. Spero Re: Joint Statement re: Proposed Protective Order [Docket No. 51] (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/5/2006)
October 4, 2006 56 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER, by Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 10/4/6, granting 53 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for Leave to File A Surreply to Parties' Joint Statement. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2006)
October 3, 2006 55
Declaration of Charlotte Falla in Support of 51 Stipulation, Declaration of Charlotte Falla in Support of Netflix's Motion For Protective Order filed byNetflix, Inc.. (Related document(s)51) (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 10/3/2006)
October 2, 2006 50
RESPONSE to 43 Reply to Defendant's Counterclaims by Netflix, Inc.. (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 10/2/2006) Modified on 10/3/2006 (sis, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2006 49 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER ON HEARING FOR DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2006 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 9/30/06. [grants docket no. 47](klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2006)
September 11, 2006 43
Blockbuster's ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Netflix, Inc. byBlockbuster, Inc., Blockbuster, Inc.. (O'Brien, William) (Filed on 9/11/2006)
September 6, 2006 41
STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Time to File Response to Counterclaims by Netflix, Inc., Netflix, Inc.. (Paige, Eugene) (Filed on 9/6/2006)
August 22, 2006 40 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER DENYING NETFLIX'S MOTION TO DISMISS; MOTION TO STRIKE; AND MOTION TO BIFURCATE by Judge Alsup denying 21 Motion to Dismiss (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2006)
August 17, 2006 39
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/17/2006 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 8/17/2006) re 21 MOTION to Dismiss OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO BIFURCATE AND STAY DEFENDANT BLOCKBUSTER'S ANTITRUST COUNTERCLAIMS AND TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF UNENFORCEABILITY AND PATENT MISUSE filed by Netflix, Inc. Motion taken under submission. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/17/2006)
August 7, 2006 38 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge Alsup granting 33 Motion for Leave to File (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2006)
August 4, 2006 37
STIPULATION and Proposed Order Granting Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Blockbuster, Inc., Blockbuster, Inc.. (O'Brien, William) (Filed on 8/4/2006)
August 3, 2006 36
Reply Memorandum re 21 MOTION to Dismiss OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO BIFURCATE AND STAY DEFENDANT BLOCKBUSTER'S ANTITRUST COUNTERCLAIMS AND TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF UNENFORCEABILITY AND PATENT MISUSE filed byNetflix, Inc.. (Lam, Leo) (Filed on 8/3/2006)
August 2, 2006 35
Proposed Order re 33 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff Netflix's Notice of Motion and Motion Under Civil L.R. 7-11 for Relief from July 28, 2006 Deadline in Case Management Order and for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Netflix, Inc.. (Lam, Leo) (Filed on 8/2/2006)
July 31, 2006 32 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RE SCHEDULE FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 31, 2006. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2006)
July 27, 2006 29
Memorandum in Opposition 21 to Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Bifurcate and Stay Antitrust Counterclaims and Strike Affirmative Defenses of Unenforceability and Patent Misuse filed byBlockbuster, Inc., Blockbuster, Inc.. (O'Brien, William) (Filed on 7/27/2006) Modified on 7/28/2006 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2006 24
Proposed Order re 22 Request for Judicial Notice,, by Netflix, Inc.. (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 7/6/2006)
June 30, 2006 19 Opinion or Order of the Court
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge To Be Assigned for Discovery purposes, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Mediation/Settlement. Tutorial for the Court set for 1/17/2007 at 1:30 PM. Claims Construction Hearing set for 1/31/2007 01:30 PM. Discovery due by 4/27/2007. Jury Trial set for 9/17/2007 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motions due by 6/14/2007. Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/30/2006. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2006)
June 29, 2006 18
Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/29/2006 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 6/29/2006), CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Laporte for Settlement Conference. Case referred to a Magistrate Judge for discovery. Claims Construction Hearing set for 1/31/2007 01:30 PM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2007 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 9/17/2007 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Tutorial Hearing set for 1/17/2007 01:30 PM. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/29/2006)
June 13, 2006 15
CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (Doc. 14) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2006)
June 9, 2006 13
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 6/9/2006)
June 8, 2006 11
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options by Blockbuster Inc. (O'Brien, William) (Filed on 6/8/2006)
May 5, 2006 10
STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Netflix, Inc.. (Chanin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/5/2006)
May 2, 2006 9
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Netflix, Inc. re 8 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, 7 Clerks Notice (Reed, Kevin) (Filed on 5/2/2006)
May 1, 2006 6 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William H. Alsup for all further proceedings. Judge Bernard Zimmerman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/1/06. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2006)
April 28, 2006 4
Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Netflix, Inc.. (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 4, 2006 3
REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding Patent Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Netflix, Inc. v. Blockbuster, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Blockbuster, Inc.
Represented By: Dominique Naomi Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Netflix, Inc.
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blockbuster, Inc.
Represented By: Donn P. Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Netflix, Inc.
Represented By: Asim M. Bhansali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Dennis Dilbeck
Represented By: Alan Himmelfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?