Santiago et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02438
Filed: April 6, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SUBMISSION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/23/2014. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
February 8, 2011 74 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Certain Plaintiffs: Julio Pacheco Alicea, Ricardo Cordero Arocho, Rene Pagan Casanova, Gladys Torres Cordova, Gladys E. Camacho Cruz, Iris Aquino De Gomez, Ana J Vaquiz De Sosa, Jesus Rodriguez Deleon, Jose A. Hernandez Diaz, Eleanor Caban Echevarria, Estate of Miguel A. Rivera Perez, Benedicto Rodriguez Franco, Maria Figueroa Garcia, Ramona Mojica Gomez, Ana C. Gonzalez Gonzalez, Manuel Gonzalez-Aviles, Esmeralda Vega Hernandez, Hector Mir o Hodge, Edgar Pena Jiminez, Ernestina Gonzales Laureano, Francisco Gonzalez Lopez, Hector R. Davila Malave, Reinaldo Gonzalez Montanez, Ana Lydia Caragena Morales, Maria Fernandez Muniz, Dorcas M. Rojas Nater, Eduardo Luis Cosme Nieves, Miguel Garci a Nieves, Aida Luz Nieves-Matos, Roberto Lopez Ortiz, Eva Hernandez Perez, Luis Gonzales Perez, Rafael Tanco Pizarro, Blasina Rodriguez Rivera, Rafael Hernandez Rivera, Rafaela Santiago Rivera, Nelson David Lopez Robles, Epifania Padilla Rodriguez, L uz A. Rosa Rodriguez, Rosa I Parilla Rodriguez, Marta T. Soto Rosado, Madeline Matias Rosario, Miguel Gomez Santana, Jose Cosme Santiago, Luz M. Santos, Miriam Sorrentini-Davila, Carmen Milagros Ortiz Torres, Juanita Gonzalez Torres, Javier Calderon Trujillo, Martin Rosario Vega, Aracelis Cruz Villafane, Rosaura Colon de Agosto, Camelia Fernandez de Emerson, Jose Acosta and Juan Miranda Alicea terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/2/2011. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
July 22, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on July 22, 2010. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
May 12, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Carmelo Velez Nieves terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/11/10. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
February 22, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Luz Otero and Victor Lozada Rosario terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/17/10. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
September 8, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer deferring ruling on (38) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ; deferring ruling on (40) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 3:06-cv-02438-CRB (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
October 1, 2008 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer dismissing 33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santiago et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?