Boatwright et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02443
Filed: April 6, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/11/09. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 16, 2009 76 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Gale Johnson, Reginaldo S. Lopez, Peter Miramontes, Clara Norwood, Nale Pascual, Ethel Wright, Ronald J. Correia and Carol Erlendson terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/11/09. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
September 30, 2009 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting re 48 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Patrick Haynes. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/28/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boatwright et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?