Morriss v. California Department of Corrections et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02471
Filed: April 7, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 10, 2012 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY MOTIONS RE ALLEGED BREACH OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/10/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
March 2, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Hon. Vaughn R. Walker no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/2/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
May 24, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Hearing on June 2, 2011. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
March 23, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 48 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Discovery, 40 Received Document filed by Shane Morriss. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/6/2011 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas.. Signed by Judge Vadas on 3/23/11. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
February 16, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 37 MOTION for dismissal of counsel filed by Shane Morriss (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
December 22, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why plaintiff's request to represent himself should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 1/7/2011. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morriss v. California Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?