Humboldt Baykeeper et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02560
Filed: April 12, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901 Environmental Cleanup Expenses
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2010 514 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING CONSENT DECREE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/9/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
September 14, 2010 490 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on September 14, 2010. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 9, 2010 487 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Case Status. Signed by Judge Jeffery S. White on September 9, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 3, 2010 486 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER CONTINUING BENCH TRIAL: Bench Trial set for 9/13/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/3/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 2, 2010 484 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 474 REQUEST re Trial Equipment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/2/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 26, 2010 482 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 26, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 13, 2010 470 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on August 13, 2010. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 12, 2010 469 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 462 STIPULATION SETTLING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FEES AND COSTS INCURRED FOR DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANTS NON-DISCLOSED WITNESSES. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/12/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
June 28, 2010 445 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying 438 Motion for Status Conference (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 24, 2010 427 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding CUE VI, LLCS Motion on Plaintiffs' First Claim. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 24, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
June 16, 2010 417 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE & ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING re 414 MOTION for Attorney Fees NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PAYMENT OF PLAINTIFFS FEES AND COSTS INCURRED IN CONDUCTING DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANTS NON-DISCLOSED WITNESSES filed by Ecological Rights Foundation, Humboldt Baykeeper. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/16/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
May 27, 2010 406 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Motion for Reconsideration and Outstanding Issues From Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 27, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 5, 2010 399 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 5, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
March 30, 2010 392 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 391 Stipulation To Extend Deadline To Complete Depositions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/30/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
February 5, 2010 373 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 5, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
January 8, 2010 347 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting in part and denying in part 323 Motion to Stay (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 6, 2010 345 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF QUESTIONS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/6/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
July 16, 2009 321 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 320 Request to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/16/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
July 9, 2009 317 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying 284 Motion for Reconsideration (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
June 19, 2009 316 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying 281 Motion to Dismiss (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
May 7, 2009 293 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Parties to File Further Briefing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 7, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
May 1, 2009 291 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule Regarding Motion For Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 1, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 30, 2009 287 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice of Questions for Hearing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 30, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
March 9, 2009 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE AMENDED ANSWERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/6/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009) Modified on 3/9/2009 (jjo, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2009 257 Opinion or Order of the Court FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/18/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
February 17, 2009 256 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JAMES LARSON FOR FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/17/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
January 12, 2009 251 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST re 248 Proposed Order filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company, CUE VI, LLC. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/12/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
October 21, 2008 246 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/21/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
February 1, 2008 149 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 2/1/2008. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humboldt Baykeeper et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?