Sakai v. Merrill Lynch Life Insurance Company et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02581
Filed: April 14, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Referring Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2009 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 19, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
April 27, 2009 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 166 Amended Document filed by Dale Sakai Settlement Conference set for 5/19/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 4/27/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
December 12, 2008 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Settlement Conference set for 4/17/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 12/12/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
October 28, 2008 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 150 MOTION TO STRIKE; DENYING 149 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 28, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 3, 2008 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to November 7, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 3, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
September 10, 2008 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 10, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
February 6, 2008 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 138 Motion to Seal Exhibits Five, Seven, Eight and Nine to the Declaration of Maureen A. Harrington in Support of Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 6, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
May 3, 2006 6 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond to complaint to June 12, 2006. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/3/2006. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sakai v. Merrill Lynch Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?