Thomas v. Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.

Case Number: 3:2006cv02705
Filed: April 20, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2010 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to dismiss with prejudice (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
October 28, 2009 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting substitution (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
August 28, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with right to revive. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
April 21, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing cmc to 8/14/09 @ 2:30 p.m.. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/17/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
January 15, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing cmc to 3/13/09. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/15/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
November 4, 2008 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing cmc to 1/16/09 re 64 . (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
September 29, 2008 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting withdrawal of attorney re 61 . Signed by Judge Illston on 9/29/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?