Hiken et al v. Department of Defense et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02812
Filed: April 25, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2013 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 129 Motion to Alter Judgment; adopting in part Report and Recommendations as to section III.A and at section IV re 139 Report and Recommendations.; granting Defendant's 140 Motion for De Novo Determinaton of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
March 5, 2013 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING MARCH 12, 2013 HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/5/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
September 25, 2012 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Hon. James Ware no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/25/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
August 29, 2012 127 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re 126 Proposed Order filed by United States Central Command, Department of Defense. Signed by Judge James Ware on August 29, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
July 3, 2012 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 115 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on July 3, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
April 11, 2012 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 106 MOTION for Reconsideration re 94 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, . Motion Hearing reset for 5/14/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on 4/9/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
March 23, 2012 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. James Ware. Hon. Marilyn H. Patel no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/23/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 22, 2012 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Reassignment and Request the Executive Committee reassign the action to Chief Judge Ware. Signed by Judge Marilyn H. Patel on 3/19/2012. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hiken et al v. Department of Defense et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?