Botkin et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02862
Filed: April 28, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Paul Bynum and David Payne terminated.Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/13/09. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
June 18, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 14 Stipulation filed by Pfizer, Inc., Richard A. Clarke, Jr, Danny Crosslin, Lawanna Ferguson, Bobbie F. Hiney, Cynthia Koontz, Phillip Andrew Koontz, Priscilla Ashley Koontz, Haven L. McClaren, Clara M. Page, Michael Page, Stacy Page, Dorothy Shaw, Pauline Botkin and Debbie Page Brown terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/16/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
February 4, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 9 Motion to Set Aside Judgment (Bynum). (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
December 16, 2008 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 8 Motion for Leave to File. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Botkin et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?