UNISYS Corporation et al v. Hynix Semiconductor, Inc,. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02915
Filed: April 28, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2010 399 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR INC. AND HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR AMERICA INC. re 388 Stipulation filed by Unisys Corporation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/21/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
December 8, 2009 397 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG AND INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES NORTH AMERICA CORP. re 395 Stipulation filed by Unisys Corporation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/8/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2009)
July 17, 2009 390 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 386 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Unisys Corporation. Signed by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/17/09. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009) Modified on 1/21/2010 (nah, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2009 383 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 374 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Unisys Corporation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/16/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
December 18, 2008 361 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 299 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. (pjhlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
November 4, 2008 326 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/4/2008. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNISYS Corporation et al v. Hynix Semiconductor, Inc,. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?