World Courier Inc v. Baron et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv03072
Filed: May 8, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Referring Judge: Wayne D. Brazil
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Property
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2006 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re: expedited discovery and return of World Courier property. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 5/30/06. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2006)
May 22, 2006 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER modifying briefing schedule and hearing date. Order to Show Cause Hearing rescheduled to 6/7/2006 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/18/06. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2006)
May 11, 2006 28 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER RE APPLICATION FOR TRO AND EXPEDITED DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 5/11/06.(tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: World Courier Inc v. Baron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?