Chevron Global Technology Services Company et al v. Little

Case Number: 3:2006cv03157
Filed: May 11, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING COURT DEADLINES IN LIGHT OF SETTLEMENT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The May 28, 2010 hearing on the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment and all dates associated with the cross-motions are vacated. The Case Management Conference is continued from June 4, 2010 to July 16, 2010; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than July 9, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 16, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 5, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING CASE DEADLINES. The last day for the parties to file and serve cross-motions for summary judgment is extended to April 16, 2010, the last day to file oppositions is extended to April 30, 2010, the last day to file replies is extended to May 7, 2010, and the hearing is extended to May 28, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 5, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
March 22, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING CASE DEADLINES. The last day for the parties to file and serve cross-motions for summary judgment is extended to April 2, 2010, the last day to file oppositions is extended to April 16, 2010, the last day to file replies is extended to April 23, 2010, and the hearing is extended to May 14, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 22, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 5, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING CASE DEADLINES. The last day for the parties to file and serve cross-motions for summary judgment is extended to March 19, 2010, the last day to file oppositions is extended to April 2, 2010, the last day to file replies is extended to April 9, 2010, and the hearing is extended to April 30, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 5, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
February 19, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING CASE DEADLINES. The last day for the parties to file and serve cross-motions for summary judgment is extended to March 5, 2010, the last day to file oppositions is extended to March 19, 2010, the last day to file replies is extended to March 26, 2010, and the hearing is extended to April 16, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 8, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF)(Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 12, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING CASE DEADLINES. The last day for the parties to file and serve cross-motions for summary judgment is extended to February 19, 2010, the last day to file oppositions is extended to March 5, 2010, the last day to file replies is extended to March 12, 2010, and the hearing is extended to April 2, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 8, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING CASE DEADLINES. The last day for the parties to file and serve cross-motions for summary judgment is extended to February 12, 2010, the last day to file oppositions is extended to February 26, 2010, the last day to file replies is extended to March 5, 2010, and the hearing is extended to March 26, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 8, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
November 25, 2008 67 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FURTHER STAY PROCEEDINGS AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to June 12, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 25, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
May 15, 2006 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, with leave to file, no later than May 26, 2006, an amended complaint alleging the requisite amount in controversy. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/15/2006. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chevron Global Technology Services Company et al v. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?