Ingrid von Mangoldt Hills v. Intensive Air Inc.

Case Number: 3:2006cv03300
Filed: May 19, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2009 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 136 Stipulation RE DISMISSAL OF ACTION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/3/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
January 27, 2009 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 134 Stipulation and continuing Case Management Conference to March 6, 2009.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/27/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
November 19, 2008 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXCUSING APPEARANCE re 130 Proposed Order filed by Michael Quilter. Signed by Judge James Larson on 11/19/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
November 3, 2008 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 11/3/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
September 19, 2008 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Conditionally Granting Toplen's Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 19, 2008. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingrid von Mangoldt Hills v. Intensive Air Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?