Shumye v. Felleke

Case Number: 3:2006cv03322
Filed: May 19, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2008 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AUGMENT RECORD ON APPEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 19, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
October 21, 2008 213 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The instant action is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, pursuant to Rules 37(b) and 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
September 22, 2008 210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 22, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 16, 2008 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO RESET HEARING; CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The hearing on plaintiff's response to the Court's order to show cause is continued from September 30, 2008 to Monday, October 6, 2008, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 16, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
September 11, 2008 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING SEPTEMBER 30, 2008 HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court schedules a hearing for Tuesday, September 30, 2008, at 10:00 a.m., to consider whether plaintiff has shown that the instant matter should not be dismissed. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 11, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shumye v. Felleke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?