Electronic Arts Inc. et al v. Giant Productions et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs Electronic Arts Inc. and Electronic Arts Music Publishing, Inc. asked that Giant Productions, Najib Marc Reghay and Alexandra Berthet indemnify and hold plaintiffs harmless against the claims asserted by defendants in a French suit. Plaintiffs alleged that they licensed defendant\'s composition entitled \"A Necessidade\" for inclusion in the FIFA 2005 video game. Defendants later challenged plaintiff\'s right to use the composition before the Paris Court of First Instance.

Plaintiff: Electronic Arts Music Publishing, Inc. and Electronic Arts Inc.
Defendant: Alexandra Berthet, Najib Marc Reghay and Giant Productions
Case Number: 3:2006cv03403
Filed: May 24, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2007 32
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal [Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)] by Electronic Arts Inc., Electronic Arts Music Publishing, Inc. (Kent, Ryan) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
February 16, 2007 31
CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2007 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2007)
January 17, 2007 30
CLERK'S NOTICE Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2007 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2007)
January 4, 2007 29
CLERK'S NOTICE Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2007 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2007)
December 12, 2006 27
CLERK'S NOTICE Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2007 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2006)
December 8, 2006 26 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REFERRING 22 MOTION for Default Judgment to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 8, 2006. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2006)
November 21, 2006 21
CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2007 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2007. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2006)
September 25, 2006 20
CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference continued to 12/29/2006 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 12/22/2006. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2006)
September 22, 2006 19
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT EA's Separate Case Management Conference Statement and [Proposed] Case Management Order filed by Electronic Arts Inc., Electronic Arts Music Publishing, Inc.. (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 9/22/2006)
September 21, 2006 16
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Electronic Arts Inc., Electronic Arts Music Publishing, Inc. re 15 Declaration in Support,, 14 MOTION for Entry of Default Request for Entry of Default Against Giant Productions (Kent, Ryan) (Filed on 9/21/2006)
September 20, 2006 13
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Electronic Arts Inc., Electronic Arts Music Publishing, Inc.. Service waived by Giant Productions (Kent, Ryan) (Filed on 9/20/2006)
September 13, 2006 11
Declaration of RYAN M. KENT in Support of 10 MOTION for Entry of Default (Request For Entry of Default) filed byElectronic Arts Inc., Electronic Arts Music Publishing, Inc.. (Related document(s)10) (Kent, Ryan) (Filed on 9/13/2006)
September 8, 2006 9
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification By Parties and Counsel (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 9/8/2006)
June 9, 2006 8
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Electronic Arts Inc., Electronic Arts Music Publishing, Inc. re 3 Initial Scheduling Scheduling Order (Kent, Ryan) (Filed on 6/9/2006)
June 5, 2006 7
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Electronic Arts Inc., Electronic Arts Music Publishing, Inc. re 6 Waiver of Service Executed,, 4 Waiver of Service Executed,, 5 Waiver of Service Executed, (Kent, Ryan) (Filed on 6/5/2006)
May 30, 2006 3 Opinion or Order of the Court
INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2006 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2006.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/30/06. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2006)
May 24, 2006 2
ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2006. Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2006 01:30 PM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/25/2006 (hdj, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Electronic Arts Inc. et al v. Giant Productions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandra Berthet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Najib Marc Reghay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giant Productions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electronic Arts Music Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Marshall Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electronic Arts Inc.
Represented By: Robert James Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?