Thomas v. Ponder et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv03581
Filed: June 5, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2012 132 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTIFICATION OF SATISFACTION OF SETTLEMENT; AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 20, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
June 13, 2012 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within ninety days, with proof of service of a copy thereon on opposing counsel, that the agreed co nsideration for the settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing order shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings as appropriate. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 13, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 5, 2012 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER returning document to Plaintiff entered by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 6/5/12. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
May 30, 2012 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER IN ADVANCE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on May 30, 2012. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 11, 2012 121 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/11/2012. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
March 26, 2012 119 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/26/12. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
May 31, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 95 DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; DENYING 93 MOTION FOR TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 31, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
April 1, 2011 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 84 MOTION FOR TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR FILING OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON GROUNDS OF QUALILFIED IMMUNITY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 1, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
February 24, 2011 83 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference on March 22, 2011, at Solano State Prison. Signed by Judge Vadas on 2/24/2011. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
January 3, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE; REFERRING CASE FOR SETTLEMENT PROCEEDINGS; DENYING 73 MOTION FOR SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 3, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
February 24, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of G. Ponder, M. J. Kircher, M. S. Evans against Otis Michael Thomas. 1. Defendants motion for summary judgment are hereby GRANTED and judgment shall be entered in favor of each of the defendants.2. Plaintiffs motions for judicial notice are hereby DENIED (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
October 30, 2008 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 47 53 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COURT TO OBTAIN AND REVIEW TRANSCRIPT OF PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION; SETTING NEW BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PENDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 30, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Ponder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?