Stinson v. Sisto

Case Number: 3:2006cv03585
Filed: June 5, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY; DIRECTING CLERK TO FORWARD FILE TO NINTH CIRCUIT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 15, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
August 3, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT: The petition is hereby DISMISSED as moot. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
July 9, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO SERVE RESPONDENT WITH ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND PETITIONER'S RESPONSE THERETO (DOCKET NOS. 43 & 44); SCHEDULING REPLY. The Court hereby DIRECTS the Clerk of the Court to serve respondent with a copy of the order t o show cause and petitioner's response. (Docket Nos. 43 & 44 ). Respondent shall file a reply to the response within twenty (20) days of the date this order is filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 9, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2009) Modified on 7/10/2009 (aaa, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stinson v. Sisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?