Willingham v. City of San Leandro et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv03744
Filed: June 12, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2009 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION FOR TRANSCRIPT AT GOVERNMENT EXPENSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 26, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
December 17, 2008 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRANSCRIPT AT GOVERNMENT EXPENSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 17, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
September 25, 2008 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 25, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willingham v. City of San Leandro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?