San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District v. GE Transportation Systems Global Signaling LLC

Case Number: 3:2006cv03749
Filed: June 13, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2010 306 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 305 Stipulation Dismissing the Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/22/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
September 28, 2010 304 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 303 Stipulation FOR CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/28/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 16, 2010 301 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 300 Stipulation to Continue Status Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 16, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 3, 2010 299 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 298 Stipulation to Continue Status Conference or to Submit Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 3, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
August 13, 2010 297 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 296 Stipulation Confirming Settlement and Vacating Pretrial and Trial Dates. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/13/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 4, 2010 287 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXCHANGE OF DEMONSTRATIVE EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 08/04/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
July 21, 2010 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 200 Administrative Motion for Immediate Relief From Deadline re Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. Whtie on 7/21/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 19, 2010 203 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/19/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
July 14, 2010 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 197 JOINT STIPULATION AND DISMISSING THE SECOND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/14/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
July 13, 2010 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SELECTION OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE OR MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 13, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
May 27, 2010 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 128 BART's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and GRANTING 124 , 184 GETS' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 10, 2010 186 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS re 128 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District, and 124 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by GE Transportation Systems Global Signaling, LLC. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 10, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
April 28, 2010 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 121 Motion for Leave to File GE Transportation Systems Global Signaling, LLC's Administrative Motion for Leave to File Under Seal and to Permit Manual Filing. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/28/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 15, 2010 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 171 Stipulation To Exceed Page Limits for Reply Briefs in Support of Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/15/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
January 28, 2010 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 117 Stipulation REGARDING DISCLOSURES OF EXPERTS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/28/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
November 30, 2009 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 114 Stipulation DISMISSING THE FOURTH AND SIXTH COUNTS OF THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/30/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
July 2, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 98 Stipulated Request Modifying Pretrial Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 2, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
May 1, 2009 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 92 Stipulation Modifying Pretrial and Trial Schedule; MOOTING 89 Joint MOTION and Notice Of Motion For Order Modifying Pretrial And Trial Schedule and 90 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 30, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
January 6, 2009 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 83 Joint Case Management Statement. Dispositive Motion hearing is scheduled for July 17, 2009 at 9:00 a.m., A Further Case Management Conference is scheduled for July 17, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. to be heard immediately following any dispositive motions. The joint case management statement shall be due on or before July 10, 2009. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/6/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District v. GE Transportation Systems Global Signaling LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?