Berry v. Evans et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv03795
Filed: June 16, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 77 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 30, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
February 5, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VOLUNTARILY DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/5/2010. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
January 14, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 1/13/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
December 16, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 67 REQUEST TO EXTEND THE REFERRAL FOR COURT ORDERED PRO SE MEDIATION PROGRAM. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 16, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
September 16, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 57 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND 61 MOTION TO SET PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE; REFERRING CASE FOR SETTLEMENT PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 16, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
October 30, 2008 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 48 MOTION TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS DEFENDANT JOHNSON; DENYING 51 MOTION TO QUASH DISMISSAL; GRANTING 54 EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 30, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. Evans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?