United States of America v. Altotech II LP

Case Number: 3:2006cv03879
Filed: June 21, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:631 Small Business Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2010 114 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/21/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 4, 2010 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving and Confirming Final Receiver's Report, Terminating Receivership and Discharging Receiver. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/4/2010. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
July 30, 2010 106 Opinion or Order of the Court WIND UP ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 7/30/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
June 30, 2010 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING RECEIVER'S NOTICE AND DETERMINATION OF CLAIMS, AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF APPROVED CLAIMS AND ESTABLISHING SUMMARY DISPOSITION PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 6/30/2010. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
March 16, 2010 96 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2010 is continued to 12/3/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/15/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
December 3, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Third Receiver's Report (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
September 28, 2009 89 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Conference set for 9/25/09 is continued to 3/19/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/25/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
June 21, 2006 4 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION FOR CONSENT ORDER OF RECEIVERSHIP. Signed by Judge William H. Alsup on 6/21/06. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Altotech II LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?