Millsmont Homeowners Association v. City of Oakland et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv03955
Filed: June 26, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2008 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION REGARDING EXECUTION OF CONSENT DECREE; ORDER THEREON. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 12, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 3, 2008 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO VACATE HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 3, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
November 18, 2008 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 6, 2008 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION; DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPIES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 6, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
February 1, 2008 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint and Case Management Schedule. The Case Management Conference previously set for March 28, 2008 is continued to June 27, 2008 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 1, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millsmont Homeowners Association v. City of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?