Lackey et al v. Infinity Broadcasting Corporation et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv03987
Filed: June 27, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2009 179 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing action with prejudice; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/11/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
March 26, 2009 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (NINETY-DAY CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL): Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/25/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
December 22, 2008 174 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING PRETRIAL FILINGS; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 12/22/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
September 17, 2008 167 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: Status conference set for 10/6/2008 at 3:00 pm; Jury Trial reset for 4/14/2009 08:30 AM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/17/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
February 1, 2008 109 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel denying 42 PLAINTIFF'S Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 58 DEFENDANTS' Motion for Summary Judgment (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lackey et al v. Infinity Broadcasting Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?