Garber v. KLA-Tencor Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Robert L. Garber, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit and City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement
Defendant: KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Estate of Richard J. Elkus, Deceased, Stephen P. Kaufman, John H. Kispert, Kenneth Levy, Kenneth L. Schroeder, John D. Tompkins, Lida Urbanek, Jeffrey Hall and Gary E. Dickerson
Petitioner: Steven Davidson and Stanley D. Spilman
3Rd Party Defendant: Stuart Nichols
Case Number: 3:2006cv04065
Filed: June 29, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER GRANTING LEAD PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REDISTRIBUTION OF REMAINING CLASS SETTLEMENT FUNDS by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #237 Motion for Settlement. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 13, 2018 Filing 240 NOTICE by KLA-Tencor Corporation Notice of Non-Opposition to #237 Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Redistribution of Remaining Class Settlement Funds (Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 3/13/2018) Modified on 3/13/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER GRANTING LEAD PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR GARY E. CANTOR TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT MOTION HEARING IN SUPPORT OF REDISTRIBUTION OF REMAINING CLASS SETTLEMENT FUNDS by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #238 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel will make arrangements through CourtCall. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
March 9, 2018 Filing 238 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
February 28, 2018 Filing 237 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Redistribution of Remaining Class Settlement Funds filed by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 3/14/2018. Replies due by 3/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER re DISTRIBUTION OF CLASS SETTLEMENT FUND re #232 Notice (Other) filed by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/31/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 30, 2010 Filing 235 Declaration in Support of #232 Notice (Other) Application for Distribution of Class Settlement Funds [CORRECTION OF DOCKET #233] filed byPolice and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Related document(s) #232 ) (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 30, 2010 Filing 234 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit re #232 Notice (Other), #235 Declaration in Support, (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 3/30/2010) Modified on 3/31/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2010 Filing 233 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #235 . *** Declaration of Michael T. Bancroft in Support of #232 Notice (Other) Application for Distribution of Class Settlement Funds filed byPolice and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #232 ) (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 3/30/2010) Modified on 3/30/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2010 Filing 232 NOTICE by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit UNOPPOSED APPLICATION IN SUPPORT OF AN ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF CLASS SETTLEMENT FUND (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
January 21, 2010 Filing 231 NOTICE of Change of Address by Nicole Catherine Lavallee Notice of Change of Address (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 7, 2009 Filing 230 NOTICE of Change of Address by Nicole Catherine Lavallee Notice of Change of Firm Name and Office Address (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
December 3, 2008 Filing 229 Letter from Nicole Lavallee to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
November 4, 2008 Filing 228 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/26/08, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2009. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
September 26, 2008 Filing 227 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/26/2008 before Judge Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 9/26/2008). (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/26/2008)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #215 Motion for Attorney Fees. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER APPROVING PLAN OF ALLOCATION by Judge Charles R. Breyer. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 224 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/26/2208. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 223 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/26/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008) Modified on 9/29/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Filing 222 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KLA-Tencor Corporation re #220 MOTION for Settlement KLA-Tencor Corporation's Statement in Support of Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement, #221 Declaration in Support, PROOF OF SERVICE (Green, Thomas) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 18, 2008 Filing 221 Declaration of Thomas R. Green in Support of #220 MOTION for Settlement KLA-Tencor Corporation's Statement in Support of Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement filed byJohn H. Kispert, Lida Urbanek, Jeffrey Hall, KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Richard J. Elkus, Jr, Stephen P. Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Green Declaration)(Related document(s) #220 ) (Green, Thomas) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 18, 2008 Filing 220 KLA-Tencor Corporation's Statement in Support of #211 Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement filed by John H. Kispert, Lida Urbanek, Jeffrey Hall, KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Richard J. Elkus, Jr, Stephen P. Kaufman. (Green, Thomas) (Filed on 9/18/2008) Modified on 9/19/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2008 Filing 219 Declaration of Nicole Lavallee SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF NICOLE LAVALLEE IN SUPPORT OF FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, PLAN OF ALLOCATION AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND EXPENSES APPLICATION filed byCity of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 2, 2008 Filing 218 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by Kenneth L. Schroeder (Priebe, David) (Filed on 9/2/2008) Modified on 9/3/2008 (slh, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2008 Filing 217 Declaration of Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel in Support of #213 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds, #214 Proposed Order,, #211 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement, #212 Proposed Order, #215 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, #216 Proposed Order,, Joint Declaration of Lead Counsel in Support of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Plan of Allocation and Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed byLouisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) #213 , #214 , #211 , #212 , #215 , #216 ) (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
August 29, 2008 Filing 216 Proposed Order re #211 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement, #213 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds, #214 Proposed Order,, #212 Proposed Order, #215 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses [Proposed] Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
August 29, 2008 Filing 215 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
August 29, 2008 Filing 214 Proposed Order re #211 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement, #213 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds, #212 Proposed Order, [Proposed] Order Approving Plan of Allocation by Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
August 29, 2008 Filing 213 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds filed by Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
August 29, 2008 Filing 212 Proposed Order re #211 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement [Proposed] Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice by Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
August 29, 2008 Filing 211 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement filed by Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
June 5, 2008 Filing 210 CLERK'S NOTICE vacating case management conference currently set for 6/13/2008. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2008)
June 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE by Judge Charles R. Breyer re(202) Motion for Settlement in case 3:06-cv-04065-CRB (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2008)
May 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER re #205 Stipulation filed by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit Case Management Conference set for 6/13/2008 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/27/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
May 23, 2008 Filing 207 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
May 21, 2008 Filing 206 Declaration of Nicole Lavallee in Support of #205 Stipulation filed byPolice and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Related document(s) #205 ) (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 5/21/2008)
May 21, 2008 Filing 205 STIPULATION STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RESCHEDULING THE MAY 30, 2008 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 5/21/2008)
May 19, 2008 Filing 204 Proposed Order re #202 MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Application of Lead Plaintiffs for Preliminary Approval of (1) Proposed Class Action Settlement; (2) Plan of Allocation; (3) Form of Settlement Notice; and (4) Scheduling Hearing on Final Approval of Settlement, the MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Application of Lead Plaintiffs for Preliminary Approval of (1) Proposed Class Action Settlement; (2) Plan of Allocation; (3) Form of Settlement Notice; and (4) Scheduling Hearing on Final Approval of Settlement, the MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Application of Lead Plaintiffs for Preliminary Approval of (1) Proposed Class Action Settlement; (2) Plan of Allocation; (3) Form of Settlement Notice; and (4) Scheduling Hearing on Final Approval of Settlement, the, #203 Declaration in Support,,,,, [Proposed] Order Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Providing for Notice by Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Filing 203 Declaration of Nicole Lavallee in Support of #202 MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Application of Lead Plaintiffs for Preliminary Approval of (1) Proposed Class Action Settlement; (2) Plan of Allocation; (3) Form of Settlement Notice; and (4) Scheduling Hearing on Final Approval of Settlement, the MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Application of Lead Plaintiffs for Preliminary Approval of (1) Proposed Class Action Settlement; (2) Plan of Allocation; (3) Form of Settlement Notice; and (4) Scheduling Hearing on Final Approval of Settlement, the MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Application of Lead Plaintiffs for Preliminary Approval of (1) Proposed Class Action Settlement; (2) Plan of Allocation; (3) Form of Settlement Notice; and (4) Scheduling Hearing on Final Approval of Settlement, the Declaration of Nicole Lavallee in Support of Unopposed Application of Lead Plaintiffs for Preliminary Approval of (1) Proposed Class Action Settlement; (2) Plan of Allocation; (3) Form of Settlement Notice; and (4) Scheduling Hearing on Final Approval of Settlement, the Plan of Allocation and for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed byLouisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2A, #3 Exhibit 2B, #4 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #202 ) (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 19, 2008 Filing 202 MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Application of Lead Plaintiffs for Preliminary Approval of (1) Proposed Class Action Settlement; (2) Plan of Allocation; (3) Form of Settlement Notice; and (4) Scheduling Hearing on Final Approval of Settlement, the Plan of Allocation and for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 5, 2008 Filing 201 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2008 08:30 AM. Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2008. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2008)
May 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #198 Motion to Relate Case C-08-2249JSW to lead case C-06-4065CRB (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2008)
May 2, 2008 Filing 199 Proposed Order RELATING CASES re #198 Motion to relate by KLA-Tencor Corporation. (Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 5/2/2008) Modified on 5/5/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2008 Filing 198 First MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to N.D. Local Rule 3-12 filed by KLA-Tencor Corporation. (Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 4/30/2008)
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 197 RELATED CASE ORDER. The court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/28/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER Denying #189 MOTION to Relate Case Class Action Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil L.r. 3-12 and 7-11 filed by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement, Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System. The court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur between 06-03445 JW In re KLA-Tencor and 06-04065 CRB Garber v. KLA-Tencor Corporation et al. Motions terminated: #189 Motion to Relate Case.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/28/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 7, 2008 Filing 195 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KLA-Tencor Corporation re #193 Stipulation (Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 3/7/2008)
March 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 194 CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION & ORDER REGARDING CONFIRMATIORY DISCOVERY MATERIALS re #193 Stipulation filed by KLA-Tencor Corporation. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/7/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2008)
March 6, 2008 Filing 193 STIPULATION Confidentiality Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Confirmatory Discovery Materials by KLA-Tencor Corporation. (Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 3/6/2008)
February 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Hon. Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/27/08. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 22, 2008 Filing 191 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit re #190 Declaration in Support, #189 MOTION to Relate Case Class Action Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil L.r. 3-12 and 7-11 (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
February 22, 2008 Filing 190 Declaration of Nicole Lavallee in Support of #189 MOTION to Relate Case Class Action Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil L.r. 3-12 and 7-11 filed byCity of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Related document(s) #189 ) (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
February 22, 2008 Filing 189 MOTION to Relate Case Class Action Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil L.r. 3-12 and 7-11 filed by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
February 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/20/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2008)
February 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Martin J. Jenkins no longer assigned to case. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2008)
February 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting #183 Stipulation filed by KLA-Tencor Corporation. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 2/13/2008. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 11, 2008 Filing 185 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byKenneth L. Schroeder. (Priebe, David) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
February 6, 2008 Filing 184 CLERK'S NOTICE Vacating Motion hearing. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 6, 2008 Filing 183 STIPULATION re #181 Notice (Other) AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE SCHEDULING OF MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT AND MOTION TO DISMISS by KLA-Tencor Corporation. (Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
January 11, 2008 Filing 182 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Progress of Settlement by John H. Kispert, Lida Urbanek, Jeffrey Hall, KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Richard J. Elkus, Jr, Stephen P. Kaufman. (Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 1/11/2008)
January 4, 2008 Filing 181 NOTICE by Kenneth L. Schroeder re #106 Proposed Order, Re-Noticing Motion To Dismiss (Priebe, David) (Filed on 1/4/2008)
December 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 180 STIPULATION AND ORDER to take motion to dismiss off calendar. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 12/12/07. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2007)
December 12, 2007 Filing 179 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO TAKE MOTION TO DISMISS OFF CALENDAR by KLA-Tencor Corporation. (Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 12/12/2007)
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 178 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the hearing on the motion to dismiss to 12/14/2007 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 11/27/07. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2007)
November 21, 2007 Filing 177 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit re #176 Stipulation, Certificate of Service (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 11/21/2007)
November 20, 2007 Filing 176 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing The Motion Hearing For Defendants' Motion To Dismiss by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicole Lavallee)(Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
October 30, 2007 Filing 175 Memorandum in Opposition PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED FEDERAL SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byPolice and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 10/30/2007)
October 26, 2007 Filing 174 NOTICE by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF MOTION HEARING (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 10/26/2007)
October 26, 2007 Filing 173 CLERK'S NOTICE continuing Motion Hearing to 11/30/2007 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2007)
October 24, 2007 Filing 172 Reply Memorandum PLAINTIFFS' REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED FEDERAL CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #151 filed byPolice and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 10/24/2007) Modified on 10/25/2007 (sv, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2007 Filing 171 Reply Memorandum re #123 MOTION to Dismiss BY DEFENDANTS EDWARD W. BARNHOLT, H. RAYMOND BINGHAM, ROBERT J. BOEHLKE, ROBERT T. BOND, RICHARD J. ELKUS, JR., JEFFREY L. HALL, STEPHEN P. KAUFMAN, JOHN H. KISPERT, MICHAEL E. MARKS, DEAN O. MORTON, LIDA URBANEK, AND RICHARD P. W JOINT REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO DISMISS BY KLA-TENCOR CORPORATION, EDWARD W. BARNHOLT, H. RAYMOND BINGHAM, ROBERT T. BOND, RICHARD J. ELKUS, JR., JEFFREY L. HALL, STEPHEN P. KAUFMAN, JOHN H. KISPERT, MICHAEL E. MARKS, DEAN O. MORTON, LIDA URBANEK, AND RICHARD P. WALLACE filed byJohn H. Kispert, Lida Urbanek, Jeffrey Hall, KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Richard J. Elkus, Jr, Stephen P. Kaufman. (Banks, Christopher) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 12, 2007 Filing 170 MEMORANDUM in Support re #129 Request for Judicial Notice,, REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF Request for Judicial Notice in Support of (1) Defendant KLA-Tencor's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) ANd (2) The INdividual KLA-TEncor Corporation Defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed byJohn H. Kispert, Lida Urbanek, Jeffrey Hall, KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Richard J. Elkus, Jr, Stephen P. Kaufman. (Related document(s) #129 ) (Banks, Christopher) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 12, 2007 Filing 169 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #151 Request for Judicial Notice, OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED FEDERAL SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byJohn H. Kispert, Lida Urbanek, Jeffrey Hall, KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Richard J. Elkus, Jr, Stephen P. Kaufman. (Related document(s) #151 ) (Banks, Christopher) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 12, 2007 Filing 168 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #151 Request for Judicial Notice DEFENDANT GARY DICKERSON'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE AND MOTION TO STRIKE filed byGary E. Dickerson. (Related document(s) #166 ) (Gaskin, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/12/2007) Modified on 10/15/2007 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2007 Filing 167 MEMORANDUM in Support re #130 Request for Judicial Notice GARY DICKERSON'S REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF HIS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed byGary E. Dickerson. (Related document(s) #166 ) (Gaskin, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/12/2007) Modified on 10/15/2007 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2007 Filing 166 Reply Memorandum DEFENDANT GARY DICKERSON'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF #125 MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Gary E. Dickerson. (Gaskin, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/12/2007) Modified on 10/15/2007 (slh, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2007 Filing 165 Reply to Opposition re #107 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Jon D. Tompkins' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Federal Securities Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Therof; Request for Judicial Notice and Declaration of Warr filed byJohn D. Tompkins. (Parker, Warrington) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 12, 2007 Filing 164 REPLY to Response to Motion re #112 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Federal Securities Class Action Complaint Stuart J. Nichols' Reply in support of Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Federal Securities Class Action Complaint filed byStuart Nichols. (Kaufhold, Steve) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 12, 2007 Filing 163 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice filed byKenneth L. Schroeder. (Priebe, David) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 12, 2007 Filing 162 Reply Memorandum re #104 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Federal Securities Class Action Complaint of Kenneth L. Schroeder; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byKenneth L. Schroeder. (Priebe, David) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 12, 2007 Filing 161 NOTICE by Stuart Nichols re #112 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Federal Securities Class Action Complaint Stuart J. Nichols' Notice of Joinder and Joinder (Kaufhold, Steve) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 12, 2007 Filing 160 Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion of Defendant Kenneth Levy to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byKenneth Levy. (Facter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 12, 2007 Filing 159 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Page Limits for Reply Briefs on Defendants' Rule 12 Motions by John H. Kispert, Lida Urbanek, Jeffrey Hall, KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Richard J. Elkus, Jr, Stephen P. Kaufman. (Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 12, 2007 Filing 158 Request for Judicial Notice Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice in Support of (1) Defendant KLA-Tencor's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b) and (2) the Individual KLA-Tencor Corporation Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b); (3) Reply Briefs in Support of Motions to Dismiss; Declaration of Joseph E. Floren In Support Thereof filed byJohn H. Kispert, Lida Urbanek, Jeffrey Hall, KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Richard J. Elkus, Jr, Stephen P. Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit 6#7 Exhibit 7#8 Exhibit 8)(Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 3, 2007 Filing 157 NOTICE by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement CITY OF PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF PENSIONS AND RETIREMENT'S REVISED CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 10/3/2007)
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 156 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: briefing schedule for defendants' reply memoranda. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 09/28/07. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007)
September 21, 2007 Filing 155 Declaration of Joseph E. Floren in Support of #154 Stipulation, filed byLida Urbanek, Jeffrey Hall, KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Richard J. Elkus, Jr, Stephen P. Kaufman. (Related document(s) #154 ) (Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 9/21/2007)
September 21, 2007 Filing 154 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Reply Memoranda on Motions to Dismiss by Lida Urbanek, Jeffrey Hall, KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Richard J. Elkus, Jr, Stephen P. Kaufman. (Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 9/21/2007)
September 8, 2007 Filing 153 MEMORANDUM in Opposition MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF LEAD PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' SEVEN MOTIONS TO DISMISS #104 , #107 , #112 , #123 , #124 , #125 , #128 filed by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 9/8/2007) Modified on 9/12/2007 (slh, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2007 Filing 152 MEMORANDUM in Opposition PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' REQUESTS FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed byPolice and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 9/7/2007)
September 7, 2007 Filing 151 Request for Judicial Notice PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED FEDERAL SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byPolice and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 9/7/2007)
September 7, 2007 Filing 150 Declaration of Nicole Lavallee DECLARATION OF NICOLE LAVALLEE IN SUPPORT OF LEAD PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' SEVEN MOTIONS TO DISMISS filed byPolice and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A#2 Exhibit Exhibit B#3 Exhibit Exhibit C#4 Exhibit Exhibit D#5 Exhibit Exhibit E#6 Exhibit Exhibit F#7 Exhibit Exhibit G#8 Exhibit Exhibit H#9 Exhibit Exhibit I#10 Exhibit Exhibit J#11 Exhibit Exhibit K#12 Exhibit Exhibit L#13 Exhibit Exhibit M#14 Exhibit Exhibit N#15 Exhibit Exhibit O#16 Exhibit Exhibit P#17 Exhibit Exhibit Q#18 Exhibit Exhibit R#19 Exhibit Exhibit S#20 Exhibit Exhibit T#21 Exhibit Exhibit U#22 Exhibit Exhibit V#23 Exhibit Exhibit W#24 Exhibit Exhibit X#25 Exhibit Exhibit Y#26 Exhibit Exhibit Z#27 Exhibit Exhibit AA#28 Exhibit Exhibit BB#29 Exhibit Exhibit CC#30 Exhibit Exhibit DD#31 Exhibit Exhibit EE#32 Exhibit Exhibit FF)(Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 9/7/2007)
September 7, 2007 Filing 149 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS DEFENDANT ROBJERT J. BOEHLKE WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 9/7/2007)
August 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER re #144 Stipulation. Plaintiffs to serve opposition papers by 9/7/07. Defs. to file replies 21 calendars days after filing of oppos. Hearing date moved, see Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 8/2/07. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2007)
August 6, 2007 Filing 147 CLERK'S NOTICE - Continuing Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing of 9/12/07 vacated and reset for 10/31/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2007)
July 27, 2007 Filing 146 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit re #145 Declaration in Support, #144 Stipulation, (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 7/27/2007)
July 27, 2007 Filing 145 Declaration in Support of #144 Stipulation, filed byPolice and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Related document(s) #144 ) (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 7/27/2007)
July 27, 2007 Filing 144 STIPULATION STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR CO-LEAD PLAINTIFFS TO FILE PAPERS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND REQUESTS FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 7/27/2007)
June 7, 2007 Filing 143 EXHIBITS re #129 Request for Judicial Notice,, filed byJohn H. Kispert, Jeffrey Hall, Gary E. Dickerson, KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Stephen P. Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 28#2 Exhibit 31#3 Exhibit 32#4 Exhibit 33 Pt 1#5 Exhibit 33 Part 2#6 Exhibit 35#7 Exhibit 36 Part 1#8 Exhibit 36 Part 2#9 Exhibit 36 Part 3#10 Exhibit 36 Part 4)(Related document(s) #129 ) (Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 6/7/2007)
May 23, 2007 Filing 142 NOTICE by Kenneth L. Schroeder re #104 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Federal Securities Class Action Complaint of Kenneth L. Schroeder; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Re-Notice of Motion) (Priebe, David) (Filed on 5/23/2007)
May 22, 2007 Filing 141 NOTICE by Stuart Nichols Corrected Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Consolidated Federal Class Action Complaint (Kaufhold, Steve) (Filed on 5/22/2007)
May 22, 2007 Filing 140 EXHIBITS re #129 Request for Judicial Notice,, Continuation of Exhibits to Doc Nos. 129, 131, 132, 134, 135 - Exhibit 36, Part C filed byLida Urbanek, Jeffrey Hall, KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Richard J. Elkus, Jr, Stephen P. Kaufman. (Related document(s) #129 ) (Heintz, Tera) (Filed on 5/22/2007)
May 22, 2007 Filing 139 EXHIBITS re #129 Request for Judicial Notice,, Continuation of Exhibits to Doc Nos. 129, 131, 132, 134, 135 - Exhibit 36, Part B2 filed byLida Urbanek, Jeffrey Hall, KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Richard J. Elkus, Jr, Stephen P. Kaufman. (Related document(s) #129 ) (Heintz, Tera) (Filed on 5/22/2007)
May 22, 2007 Filing 138 EXHIBITS re #129 Request for Judicial Notice,, Continuation of Exhibits to Doc Nos. 129, 131, 132, 134, 135 - Exhibit 36, Part B1 filed byLida Urbanek, Jeffrey Hall, KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Richard J. Elkus, Jr, Stephen P. Kaufman. (Related document(s) #129 ) (Heintz, Tera) (Filed on 5/22/2007)
May 22, 2007 Filing 137 EXHIBITS re #129 Request for Judicial Notice,, Continuation of Exhibits to Doc Nos. 129, 131, 132, 134, 135 - Exhibit 36, Part A filed byLida Urbanek, Jeffrey Hall, KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Richard J. Elkus, Jr, Stephen P. Kaufman. (Related document(s) #129 ) (Heintz, Tera) (Filed on 5/22/2007)
May 22, 2007 Filing 136 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit re #103 Amended Complaint (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 5/22/2007)
May 22, 2007 Filing 135 EXHIBITS Continuation of Exhibits to Doc Nos. 129, 131, 132, 134 - Exhibits 34, 35, 37, 38 filed byJohn H. Kispert, Lida Urbanek, Jeffrey Hall, KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Richard J. Elkus, Jr, Stephen P. Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 38#2 Exhibit 34#3 Exhibit 37#4 Exhibit 37)(Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 5/22/2007)
May 22, 2007 Filing 134 EXHIBITS CONTINUED FROM DOC 129, 131 AND 132, EXHIBITS 23 THROUGH 30 filed byJohn H. Kispert, Lida Urbanek, Jeffrey Hall, KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Richard J. Elkus, Jr, Stephen P. Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23#2 Exhibit 24#3 Exhibit 25#4 Exhibit 26#5 Exhibit 27#6 Exhibit 28#7 Exhibit 30)(Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 5/22/2007)
May 22, 2007 Filing 133 Appendix re #125 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GARY DICKERSON'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, #126 Notice (Other), #130 Request for Judicial Notice, APPENDIX OF UNPUBLISHED AUTHORITY filed byGary E. Dickerson. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1-2#2 Appendix Tab 3#3 Appendix Tab 4#4 Appendix Tab 5-6#5 Appendix Tab 7-8#6 Appendix TAb 9-12)(Related document(s) #125 , #126 , #130 ) (Gaskin, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/22/2007)
May 22, 2007 Filing 132 EXHIBITS CONTINUED FROM DOC. 129 AND 131 - EXHIBITS 16-22 filed byJohn H. Kispert, Jeffrey Hall, Gary E. Dickerson, KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Stephen P. Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16#2 Exhibit 17#3 Exhibit 18#4 Exhibit 19#5 Exhibit 20#6 Exhibit 21#7 Exhibit 22)(Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 5/22/2007)
May 22, 2007 Filing 131 EXHIBITS CONTINUED WITH DOC NO. 129, EXHIBITS 6 THROUGH 15 filed byJohn H. Kispert, Jeffrey Hall, Gary E. Dickerson, KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Stephen P. Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6#2 Exhibit 7#3 Exhibit 8#4 Exhibit 9#5 Exhibit 10#6 Exhibit 11#7 Exhibit #8 Exhibit 13#9 Exhibit 14#10 Exhibit 15)(Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 5/22/2007)
May 21, 2007 Filing 130 Request for Judicial Notice re #128 MOTION to Dismiss by KLA-Tencor Corporation, #126 Notice (Other) filed byGary E. Dickerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 2)#2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 2)#3 Exhibit B (Part 1 of 2)#4 Exhibit B (Part 2 of 2)#5 Exhibit C#6 Exhibit D-E#7 Exhibit F-H)(Related document(s) #128 , #126 ) (Gaskin, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Filing 129 Request for Judicial Notice ISO (1) DEFENDANT KLA-TENCOR'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(B)(6) AND (2) INDIVIDUAL KLA-TENCOR CORPORATION DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(B)(6); DECLARATION OF JOSEPH E. FLOREN ISO THEREOF filed byJohn H. Kispert, Jeffrey Hall, Gary E. Dickerson, KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Stephen P. Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 3#3 Exhibit 4#4 Exhibit 5#5 Exhibit 1)(Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Filing 128 MOTION to Dismiss by KLA-Tencor Corporation filed by KLA-Tencor Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Banks, Christopher) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Filing 127 Proposed Order re #124 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion of Defendant Kenneth Levy to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof [Proposed] Order Granting Motion of Defendant Kenneth Levy to Dismiss Consolidated Federal Securities Class Action Complaint by Kenneth Levy. (Facter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Filing 126 NOTICE by Gary E. Dickerson re #125 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GARY DICKERSON'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (Gaskin, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Filing 125 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GARY DICKERSON'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Gary E. Dickerson. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Gaskin, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Filing 124 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion of Defendant Kenneth Levy to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Kenneth Levy. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Facter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Filing 123 MOTION to Dismiss BY DEFENDANTS EDWARD W. BARNHOLT, H. RAYMOND BINGHAM, ROBERT J. BOEHLKE, ROBERT T. BOND, RICHARD J. ELKUS, JR., JEFFREY L. HALL, STEPHEN P. KAUFMAN, JOHN H. KISPERT, MICHAEL E. MARKS, DEAN O. MORTON, LIDA URBANEK, AND RICHARD P. WALLACE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by John H. Kispert, Lida Urbanek, Jeffrey Hall, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Richard J. Elkus, Jr, Stephen P. Kaufman. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Banks, Christopher) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Filing 122 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS EDWARD W. BARNHOLT, H. RAYMOND BINGHAM, ROBERT J. BOEHLKE, ROBERT T. BOND, RICHARD J. ELKUS, JR., JEFFREY L. HALL, STEPHEN P. KAUFMAN, JOHN H. KISPERT, MICHAEL E. MARKS, DEAN O. MORTON, LIDA URBANEK, AND RICHARD P. WALLACE'S MOTION TO DISMISS by John H. Kispert, Lida Urbanek, Jeffrey Hall, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Richard J. Elkus, Jr, Stephen P. Kaufman. (Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Filing 121 JOINDER re #128 KLA-TENCOR CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by John H. Kispert, Lida Urbanek, Jeffrey Hall, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Richard J. Elkus, Jr, Stephen P. Kaufman. (Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 5/21/2007) Modified on 5/22/2007 (slh, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2007 Filing 120 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #122 . *** Proposed Order DEFENDANTS EDWARD W. BARNHOLT, H. RAYMOND BINGHAM, ROBERT J. BOEHLKE, ROBERT T. BOND, RICHARD J. ELKUS, JR., JEFFREY L. HALL, STEPHEN P. KAUFMAN, JOHN H. KISPERT, MICHAEL E. MARKS, DEAN O. MORTON, LIDA URBANEK, AND RICHARD P. WALLACE'S JOINDER IN KLA-TENCOR CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS by John H. Kispert, Lida Urbanek, Jeffrey Hall, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Richard J. Elkus, Jr, Stephen P. Kaufman. (Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 5/21/2007) Modified on 5/22/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2007 Filing 119 Joinder Stuart J. Nichols' Notice of Joinder and Joinder in Individual Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Federal Class Action Complaint by Stuart Nichols. (Kaufhold, Steve) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Filing 118 Request for Judicial Notice re #112 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Federal Securities Class Action Complaint filed byStuart Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Part A)#2 Exhibit 1 (Part B)#3 Exhibit 1 (Part C)#4 Exhibit 2 (Part A)#5 Exhibit 2 (Part B))(Related document(s) #112 ) (Kaufhold, Steve) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Filing 117 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING KLA-TENCOR CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS by KLA-Tencor Corporation. (Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Filing 116 JOINDER KLA-TENCOR CORPORATION'S JOINDER IN INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS filed by KLA-Tencor Corporation. (Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 5/21/2007) Modified on 5/22/2007 (slh, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2007 Filing 115 Proposed Order re #112 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Federal Securities Class Action Complaint by Stuart Nichols. (Kaufhold, Steve) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Filing 114 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Joseph Edward Floren DEFENDANT JOHN H. KISPERT'S NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL (Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Filing 113 Declaration of Steven S. Kaufhold in Support of #112 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Federal Securities Class Action Complaint filed byStuart Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #112 ) (Kaufhold, Steve) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Filing 112 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Federal Securities Class Action Complaint filed by Stuart Nichols. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Kaufhold, Steve) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Filing 111 Proposed Order re #107 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Jon D. Tompkins' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Federal Securities Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Therof; Request for Judicial Notice and Declaration of Warr [Proposed] Order Granting Jon D. Tompkins' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Federal Securities Class Action Complaint by John D. Tompkins. (Parker, Warrington) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Filing 110 Appendix re #107 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Jon D. Tompkins' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Federal Securities Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Therof; Request for Judicial Notice and Declaration of Warr Appendix of Non-Published Authorities filed byJohn D. Tompkins. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1#2 Appendix 2#3 Affidavit 3#4 Appendix 4#5 Appendix 5#6 Appendix 6#7 Appendix 7#8 Appendix 8#9 Appendix 9#10 Appendix 10)(Related document(s) #107 ) (Parker, Warrington) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Filing 109 Request for Judicial Notice re #107 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Jon D. Tompkins' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Federal Securities Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Therof; Request for Judicial Notice and Declaration of Warr Request for Judicial Notice and Declaration of Warrington S. Parker III in Support of Defendant Jon D. Tompkins' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Federal Securities Class Action Complaint filed byJohn D. Tompkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #107 ) (Parker, Warrington) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Filing 108 JOINDER re #128 KLA-Tencor Corporation's Motion to Dismiss filed by John D. Tompkins. (Parker, Warrington) (Filed on 5/21/2007) Modified on 5/22/2007 (slh, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2007 Filing 107 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Jon D. Tompkins' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Federal Securities Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Therof; Request for Judicial Notice and Declaration of Warrington S. Parker III in Support Thereof [Request for Judicial Notice Filed Concurrently] filed by John D. Tompkins. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Parker, Warrington) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Filing 106 Proposed Order re #104 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Federal Securities Class Action Complaint of Kenneth L. Schroeder; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Kenneth L. Schroeder. (Priebe, David) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Filing 105 Declaration of David Priebe in Support of #104 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Federal Securities Class Action Complaint of Kenneth L. Schroeder; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byKenneth L. Schroeder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #104 ) (Priebe, David) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Filing 104 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Federal Securities Class Action Complaint of Kenneth L. Schroeder; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Kenneth L. Schroeder. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Priebe, David) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 18, 2007 Filing 103 AMENDED COMPLAINT AMENDMENT TO CONSOLIDATED FEDERAL SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against all defendants. Filed byPolice and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 5/18/2007)
May 18, 2007 Filing 102 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING PAGE LIMITS FOR DEFENDANTS' RULE 12 MOTIONS AND PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITIONS THERETO by KLA-Tencor Corporation. (Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 5/18/2007)
May 18, 2007 Filing 101 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Craig David Martin (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 5/18/2007)
April 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #97 Stipulation. Defendants' Responsive pleadings due by 5/21/2007; Plaintiffs' opposition due 8/6/07; Replies due 8/27/07. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco (special setting). The Case Management Conference of 5/15/07 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 4/16/07. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 17, 2007 Filing 99 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. Service waived by Gary E. Dickerson waiver sent on 4/2/2007, answer due 6/1/2007. (Hale, Lesley) (Filed on 4/17/2007)
April 11, 2007 Filing 98 Declaration of JOSEPH E. FLOREN in Support of #97 Stipulation AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' RULE 12 MOTIONS filed byKLA-Tencor Corporation. (Related document(s) #97 ) (Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 4/11/2007)
April 11, 2007 Filing 97 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' RULE 12 MOTIONS by KLA-Tencor Corporation. (Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 4/11/2007)
April 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins granting 94 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Mark A. Belnick (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins granting 93 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Christopher D. Kercher (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 3, 2007 Filing 94 MOTION of Mark A. Belnick for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611004801) filed by Stuart Nichols, Stuart Nichols. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2007)
April 3, 2007 Filing 93 MOTION of Christopher D. Kercher for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611004800) filed by Stuart Nichols. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2007)
April 2, 2007 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Steve Kaufhold Notice of Appearance by Mark A. Belnick (Kaufhold, Steve) (Filed on 4/2/2007)
April 2, 2007 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Steve Kaufhold and Christopher Kercher (Kaufhold, Steve) (Filed on 4/2/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2007 (slh, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2007 Filing 90 AMENDED COMPLAINT CONSOLIDATED FEDERAL SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against all defendants. Filed byPolice and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
February 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to file consolidated class action complaint and setting briefing schedule for responsive motions. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 02/20/07. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2007)
February 12, 2007 Filing 88 Declaration of Nicole Lavallee in Support of #87 Stipulation, filed byPolice and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Related document(s) #87 ) (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 2/12/2007)
February 12, 2007 Filing 87 STIPULATION STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR RESPONSIVE MOTIONS by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 2/12/2007)
January 25, 2007 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Denis Francis Sheils (Sheils, Denis) (Filed on 1/25/2007)
December 13, 2006 Filing 85 NOTICE by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit re #84 Order Notice of Entry of Order (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 12/13/2006)
December 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER grating #82 Stipulation, filed by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit,. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 12/11/2006. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2006)
December 8, 2006 Filing 83 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit re #82 Stipulation, (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 12/8/2006)
December 8, 2006 Filing 82 STIPULATION STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT UNTIL RESTATEMENT IS ISSUED AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR RESPONSIVE MOTIONS by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 12/8/2006)
December 4, 2006 Filing 81 NOTICE by Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit re #80 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Notice of Entry of Order (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 12/4/2006)
November 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #78 Stipulation, filed by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit, Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2007 02:00 PM. Joint Case Management Conference Statement due 5/7/2007. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 11/27/2006. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2006)
November 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins granting #77 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Craig D Martin for John H. Kispert, K.C. Allan for John H. Kispert. Attorney Benjamin P. Smith terminated (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2006)
November 15, 2006 Filing 78 STIPULATION STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, ESTABLISHING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR RESPONSIVE MOTION(S) AND VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Hale, Lesley) (Filed on 11/15/2006)
November 15, 2006 Filing 77 MOTION to Substitute Attorney NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL filed by John H. Kispert. (Smith, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/15/2006)
November 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins GRANTING 70 Motion for Pro Hac Vice admission of attorney Sherrie R. Savett. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2006)
November 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins GRANTING 69 Motion for Pro Hac Vice admission of attorney Douglas M. Risen. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2006)
November 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins GRANTING 68 Motion for Pro Hac Vice admission of attorney Denis F. Sheils. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2006)
November 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins GRANTING 67 Motion for Pro Hac Vice admission of attorney William E. Hoese. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2006)
November 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins GRANTING 66 Motion for Pro Hac Vice admission of attorney Joseph C. Kohn. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2006)
November 13, 2006 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by David Priebe of DLA Piper US LLP (Priebe, David) (Filed on 11/13/2006)
November 8, 2006 Filing 70 MOTION of Sherrie R. Savett for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (fee paid; receipt no. 3392231) filed by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement, Robert L. Garber, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2006)
November 8, 2006 Filing 69 MOTION Douglas M. Risen for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (fee paid; receipt no. 3392231) filed by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement, Robert L. Garber, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2006)
November 8, 2006 Filing 68 MOTION of Denis F. Sheils for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (fee paid; receipt no. 3392231) filed by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement, Robert L. Garber, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2006)
November 8, 2006 Filing 67 MOTION of William E. Hoese for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (fee paid; receipt no. 3392231) filed by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement, Robert L. Garber, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2006)
November 8, 2006 Filing 66 MOTION of Jospeh C. Kohn for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (fee paid; receipt no. 3392231) filed by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement, Robert L. Garber, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2006)
October 23, 2006 Filing 65 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Benjamin P. Smith on Behalf of Defendant Kenneth Levy (Smith, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/23/2006)
October 23, 2006 Filing 64 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Benjamin P. Smith on Behalf of Defendant Kenneth L. Schroeder (Smith, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/23/2006)
October 23, 2006 Filing 63 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Benjamin P. Smith on Behalf of Defendant Jon D. Tompkins (Smith, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/23/2006)
October 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins granting Plaintiffs' Joint Motion Consolidating Related Actions, Appointing Co Lead Plaintiffs, and Approving Plaintiffs' Choice of Lead Counsel. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2006)
October 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins GRANTING 58 Motion for Pro Hac Vice admission of attorney Ira Neil Richards. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2006)
October 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins GRANTING 57 Motion for Pro Hac Vice admission of attorney Kenneth I. Trujillo. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2006)
October 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins GRANTING 56 Motion for Pro Hac Vice admission of attorney kathryn C. Harr. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2006)
October 10, 2006 Filing 58 MOTION of Ira Neil Richards for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (fee paid; receipt no. 3391029) filed by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2006)
October 10, 2006 Filing 57 MOTION of Kenneth I. Trujillo for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (fee paid; receipt no. 3391030) filed by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2006)
October 10, 2006 Filing 56 MOTION of Kathryn C. Harr for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (fee paid; receipt no. 3391031) filed by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2006)
October 10, 2006 Filing 55 Proposed Order re #12 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel PROPOSED ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINTING CO-LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND APPROVING THEIR CHOICE OF COUNSEL AS LEAD COUNSEL by Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System. (Hale, Lesley) (Filed on 10/10/2006)
October 5, 2006 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven Davidson re #47 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Bishop, Patrice) (Filed on 10/5/2006)
October 5, 2006 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement [Proof Of Service] (Bennett, Paul) (Filed on 10/5/2006)
October 5, 2006 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Thomas C. Bright Pursuant To Civil L.R. 3-7(d) by Paul F. Bennett on behalf of City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement (Bennett, Paul) (Filed on 10/5/2006)
October 5, 2006 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Joseph M. Barton Pursuant To Civil L.R. 3-7(d) by Paul F. Bennett on behalf of City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement (Bennett, Paul) (Filed on 10/5/2006)
October 5, 2006 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Paul F. Bennett Pursuant To Civil L.R. 3-7(d) by Paul F. Bennett on behalf of City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement (Bennett, Paul) (Filed on 10/5/2006)
October 4, 2006 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE of Counsel CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL SHERRIE R. SAVETT PURSUANT TO CIV. L.R. 3-7(D) by Christopher T. Heffelfinger on behalf of City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 10/4/2006)
October 4, 2006 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE of Counsel CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL DOUGLAS M. RISEN PURSUANT TO CIV. L.R. 3-7(D) by Christopher T. Heffelfinger on behalf of City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 10/4/2006)
October 3, 2006 Filing 47 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion re #15 filed bySteven Davidson. (Bishop, Patrice) (Filed on 10/3/2006)
October 3, 2006 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Christopher T. Heffelfinger on behalf of Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 10/3/2006)
October 3, 2006 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System re #44 Reply Memorandum, (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 10/3/2006)
October 3, 2006 Filing 44 Reply Memorandum JOINT REPLY OF THE POLICE AND FIRE RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF DETROIT, THE LOUISIANA MUNICIPAL POLICE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM AND THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF PENSIONS AND RETIREMENT REGARDING THE COMPETING LEAD PLAINTIFF MOTIONS filed byLouisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 10/3/2006)
October 3, 2006 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Nicole Lavallee on behalf of Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 10/3/2006)
October 3, 2006 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE of Counsel CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL WILLIAM E. HOESE PURSUANT TO CIV. L.R. 3-7(D) by Christopher T. Heffelfinger on behalf of Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 10/3/2006)
October 3, 2006 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE of Counsel CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL JOSEPH C. KOHN PURSUANT TO CIV. L.R. 3-7(D) by Christopher T. Heffelfinger on behalf of Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 10/3/2006)
October 3, 2006 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE of Counsel CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL DENIS F. SHEILS PURSUANT TO CIV. L.R. 3-7(D) by Christopher T. Heffelfinger on behalf of Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 10/3/2006)
September 26, 2006 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit re #38 Declaration in Opposition,, #37 Memorandum in Opposition, (Hale, Lesley) (Filed on 9/26/2006)
September 26, 2006 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Lesley A. Hale in Opposition to #37 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byPolice and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit Exhibit 6#7 Exhibit Exhibit 7#8 Exhibit Exhibit 8#9 Exhibit Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) #37 ) (Hale, Lesley) (Filed on 9/26/2006)
September 26, 2006 Filing 37 Memorandum in Opposition JOINT MEMORANDUM OF THE POLICE AND FIRE RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF DETROIT, THE LOUISIANA MUNICIPAL POLICE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, AND THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF PENSIONS AND RETIREMENT IN OPPOSITION TO THE COMPETING LEAD PLAINTIFF MOTIONS filed byPolice and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 9/26/2006)
September 26, 2006 Filing 36 NOTICE by John H. Kispert, Kenneth Levy, Kenneth L. Schroeder, John D. Tompkins, Lida Urbanek, Jeffrey Hall, KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Richard J. Elkus, Jr, Stephen P. Kaufman of Nonopposition by Defendants to all Pending Motions for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Counsel (Smith, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/26/2006)
September 1, 2006 Filing 34 Renotice motion hearing re #12 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, #15 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation of All Related Actions, #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, #33 Amended MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel And Supporting Memorandum Of Law Joint Amended Notice of Hearing filed byLouisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 9/1/2006)
August 29, 2006 Filing 33 Amended MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel And Supporting Memorandum Of Law filed by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bennett, Paul) (Filed on 8/29/2006)
August 29, 2006 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement re #30 Proposed Order, #29 Declaration in Support,, #28 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel And Supporting Memorandum Of Law [Proof Of Service Pursuant To Civil L.R. 23-2] (Bennett, Paul) (Filed on 8/29/2006)
August 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASES C06-3345JW, C06-4065MJJ, AND C06-4709MHP. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/28/06. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 28, 2006 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement [Proof Of Service] (Bennett, Paul) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 28, 2006 Filing 30 Proposed Order re #28 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel And Supporting Memorandum Of Law by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement. (Bennett, Paul) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 28, 2006 Filing 29 Declaration of Douglas Risen in Support of #28 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel And Supporting Memorandum Of Law filed byCity of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #28 ) (Bennett, Paul) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 28, 2006 Filing 28 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel And Supporting Memorandum Of Law filed by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Bennett, Paul) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 28, 2006 Filing 27 Proposed Order re #12 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 28, 2006 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit re #13 Declaration in Support,, #12 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, #14 Declaration in Support, (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 28, 2006 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven Davidson re #21 Proposed Order, #15 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation of All Related Actions, #24 Certificate of Counsel, #16 Memorandum in Support, #19 Declaration in Support, (Bishop, Patrice) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 28, 2006 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Patrice L. Bishop on behalf of Steven Davidson (Bishop, Patrice) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 28, 2006 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stanley D. Spilman re #18 Memorandum in Support, #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, #22 Proposed Order, #20 Declaration in Support (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 28, 2006 Filing 22 Proposed Order re #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Stanley D. Spilman. (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 28, 2006 Filing 21 Proposed Order re #15 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation of All Related Actions by Steven Davidson. (Bishop, Patrice) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 28, 2006 Filing 20 Declaration of Roy L. Jacobs in Support of #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byStanley D. Spilman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 28, 2006 Filing 19 Declaration in Support of #15 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation of All Related Actions filed bySteven Davidson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit B-1#4 Exhibit C#5 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #15 ) (Bishop, Patrice) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 28, 2006 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byStanley D. Spilman. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 28, 2006 Filing 17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Stanley D. Spilman. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2006 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 28, 2006 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation of All Related Actions filed bySteven Davidson. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Bishop, Patrice) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 28, 2006 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and for Consolidation of All Related Actions filed by Steven Davidson. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Bishop, Patrice) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 28, 2006 Filing 14 Declaration of Christopher T. Heffelfinger in Support of #12 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byLouisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 28, 2006 Filing 13 Declaration of Denis F. Sheils in Support of #12 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byLouisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 28, 2006 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Mark Gardy. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2006)
August 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of James Notis. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2006)
August 4, 2006 Filing 9 MOTION of Mark C. Gardy for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (fee paid; receipt no. 3388598) filed by Robert L. Garber. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2006)
August 4, 2006 Filing 8 MOTION of James Notis for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (fee paid; receipt no. 338599) filed by Robert L. Garber. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2006)
July 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Stipulation, filed by KLA-Tencor Corporation,. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 7/31/2006. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2006)
July 28, 2006 Filing 6 Declaration of JOSEPH E. FLOREN in Support of #5 Stipulation, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, ESTABLISHING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR RESPONSIVE MOTION(S), AND CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed byKLA-Tencor Corporation. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 7/28/2006)
July 28, 2006 Filing 5 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, ESTABLISHING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR RESPONSIVE MOTION(S), AND CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by KLA-Tencor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 7/28/2006)
July 17, 2006 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert L. Garber. KLA-Tencor Corporation served on 7/10/2006, answer due 7/31/2006. (Green, Robert) (Filed on 7/17/2006)
July 13, 2006 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against all defendants. Filed byRobert L. Garber. (Guarnieri, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/13/2006)
June 29, 2006 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due 9/26/2006 & Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2006 at 2:00 P.M.. (Attachments: #(1) Standing Order). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2006)
June 29, 2006 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & Jury Trial Demanded - [Summons Issued] against John H. Kispert, Kenneth Levy, Kenneth L. Schroeder, John D. Tompkins, Lida Urbanek, KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Richard J. Elkus, Jr. & Stephen P. Kaufman, [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 3387276]. Filed by Plaintiff Robert L. Garber. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/5/2006 (slh, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2006 SUMMONS Issued as to John H. Kispert, Kenneth Levy, Kenneth L. Schroeder, John D. Tompkins, Lida Urbanek, KLA-Tencor Corporation, Edward W. Barnholt, H. Raymond Bingham, Robert T. Bond, Richard J. Elkus, Jr. & Stephen P. Kaufman. (tn, COURT STAFF)
June 29, 2006 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garber v. KLA-Tencor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Garber
Represented By: Robert S. Green
Represented By: Denis Francis Sheils
Represented By: Douglas Matthew Risen
Represented By: Elizabeth C Guarnieri
Represented By: James S. Notis
Represented By: Joseph C Kohn,
Represented By: Mark C. Gardy
Represented By: Sherrie R. Savett
Represented By: William E. Hoese,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: Christopher T. Heffelfinger
Represented By: Lesley Ann Hale
Represented By: Nicole Catherine Lavallee
Represented By: Denis Francis Sheils
Represented By: Douglas Matthew Risen
Represented By: Joseph C Kohn,
Represented By: Sherrie R. Savett
Represented By: William E. Hoese,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit
Represented By: Christopher T. Heffelfinger
Represented By: Lesley Ann Hale
Represented By: Nicole Catherine Lavallee
Represented By: Denis Francis Sheils
Represented By: Douglas Matthew Risen
Represented By: Joseph C Kohn,
Represented By: Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a
Represented By: Sherrie R. Savett
Represented By: William E. Hoese,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement
Represented By: Christopher T. Heffelfinger
Represented By: Nicole Catherine Lavallee
Represented By: Denis Francis Sheils
Represented By: Douglas Matthew Risen
Represented By: Ira Neil Richards
Represented By: Joseph C Kohn,
Represented By: Kathryn C Harr,
Represented By: Paul F. Bennett
Represented By: Sherrie R. Savett
Represented By: William E. Hoese,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KLA-Tencor Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick Smith
Represented By: Christopher J. Banks
Represented By: Joseph Edward Floren
Represented By: Matthew Sinclair Weiler
Represented By: Tera Marie Heintz
Represented By: Thomas R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward W. Barnholt
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick Smith
Represented By: Christopher J. Banks
Represented By: Joseph Edward Floren
Represented By: Matthew Sinclair Weiler
Represented By: Tera Marie Heintz
Represented By: Thomas R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Raymond Bingham
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick Smith
Represented By: Christopher J. Banks
Represented By: Joseph Edward Floren
Represented By: Matthew Sinclair Weiler
Represented By: Tera Marie Heintz
Represented By: Thomas R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert T. Bond
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick Smith
Represented By: Christopher J. Banks
Represented By: Joseph Edward Floren
Represented By: Matthew Sinclair Weiler
Represented By: Tera Marie Heintz
Represented By: Thomas R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Richard J. Elkus, Deceased
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick Smith
Represented By: Christopher J. Banks
Represented By: Joseph Edward Floren
Represented By: Matthew Sinclair Weiler
Represented By: Tera Marie Heintz
Represented By: Thomas R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen P. Kaufman
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick Smith
Represented By: Christopher J. Banks
Represented By: Joseph Edward Floren
Represented By: Matthew Sinclair Weiler
Represented By: Tera Marie Heintz
Represented By: Thomas R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Kispert
Represented By: Christopher J. Banks
Represented By: Craig David Martin
Represented By: John Henry Hemann
Represented By: KC Waldron
Represented By: Tera Marie Heintz
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick Smith
Represented By: Joseph Edward Floren
Represented By: Thomas R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Levy
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Facter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth L. Schroeder
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick Smith
Represented By: David Allen Priebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Tompkins
Represented By: Michael J. Shepard
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick Smith
Represented By: Warrington S. Parker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lida Urbanek
Represented By: Thomas R. Green
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick Smith
Represented By: Christopher J. Banks
Represented By: Joseph Edward Floren
Represented By: Matthew Sinclair Weiler
Represented By: Tera Marie Heintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Hall
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick Smith
Represented By: Christopher J. Banks
Represented By: Joseph Edward Floren
Represented By: Matthew Sinclair Weiler
Represented By: Tera Marie Heintz
Represented By: Thomas R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary E. Dickerson
Represented By: Jonathan B. Gaskin
Represented By: Joseph Edward Floren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Davidson
Represented By: Patrice L. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stanley D. Spilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Stuart Nichols
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Represented By: Christopher D. Kercher
Represented By: Mark A. Belnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?