Glass et al v. UBS Financial Services Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv04068
Filed: June 30, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0401 Labor Management Disclosure Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2010 371 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONFIRMING PROOF OF SETTLEMENT PAYMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 28, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
January 12, 2010 361 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO FILE REPORTS UNDER THE JOINT STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE. The parties' request to file, no later than January 22, 2010, the final reports required by the terms of the Joint Stipulation is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 12, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
December 18, 2009 359 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: LETTER FROM CLAIMANT MARK R. HURWITZ; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. The Court directs the parties to meet and confer, no later than January 8, 2010, for the purpose of determining what action, if any, has been taken by the Claims Administrator reg arding Hurwitz's claim. Further, the Court directs the parties to file and serve on Hurwitz, no later than January 22, 2010, a joint statement advising the Court as to the status of Hurwitzs claim. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 18, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glass et al v. UBS Financial Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?