In re VERISIGN, INC. DERIVATIVE LITIGATION

Case Number: 3:2006cv04165
Filed: July 5, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Securities & Exchange Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2010 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Chambers Copies signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/13/2010.(pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010) Modified on 5/13/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2009 134 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 133 Stipulation filed by VeriSign Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/17/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
August 28, 2009 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 128 Stipulation rescheduling Case Management Conference filed by VeriSign Inc. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2009 02:30 PM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton, courtroom 5 on the 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/28/09. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
June 11, 2009 125 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER rescheduling the Case Management Conference to 7/30/2009 at 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 06/11/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
January 30, 2009 123 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 122 Stipulation filed by VeriSign Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/30/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
November 24, 2008 120 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 119 Stipulation filed by VeriSign Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/24/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re VERISIGN, INC. DERIVATIVE LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?