Truong v. Runnels

Case Number: 3:2006cv04235
Filed: July 10, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of David Runnels against Hi Quoc Truong, The petition for a writ of habeas corpus is hereby DENIED.A certificate of appealability is hereby DENIED. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2011)
December 27, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. The petition for a writ of habeas corpus is denied. A certificate of appealability is denied. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of respondent and close the file. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 27, 2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
May 28, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION. The time to comply with the Amended Order Directing Parties to Supplement Record is extended to July 2, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 28, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 13, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUPPLEMENT RECORD. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 13, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
October 21, 2008 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO FILE SUPPLEMENT TO ANSWER. Respondent is directed to supplement his answer by filing, no later than October 31, 2008, additional excerpts of the state court record, specifically, copies of Appellant's Opening Brief, Respondent's Brief, and Appellant's Reply Brief, if any, filed in the California Court of Appeal in connection with petitioner's direct appeal. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 21, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
July 31, 2006 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maxine M. Chesney GRANTING 2 Motion to stay federal habeas petition pending exhaustion of claims in state court. Petitioner is cautioned that if he wishes to have this Court consider his claims, he must notify this Court, within thirty days of the state Supreme Court?s ruling on his state court petition, that he wishes to reopen this action. The Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE the file pending the stay of this action. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Truong v. Runnels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?