The State of California by its Attorney General Bill Lockyer and the City and County of San Francisco Ex Rel Dennis J. Herrera and the Los Angeles Unified School District on Behalf of all other Politi et al v. Infineon Technologies AG et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv04333
Filed: July 14, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2011 503 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE: 1) APPOINTMENT OF HON. CHARLES RENFREW AS SPECIAL MASTER; AND 2) TREATMENT OF THE SETTLEMENT FUNDS AS QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUNDS UNDER TREASURY REGULATIONS re (2101 in 4:02-md-01486-PJH) Stipulation, filed by Petro Computer Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/16/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
November 29, 2010 502 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER re:1) APPOINTMENT OF HON. CHARLES B. RENFREW AS SPECIAL MASTER; AND 2) TREATMENT OF THE SETTLEMENT FUNDS AS QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUNDS UNDER TREASURY REGULATIONS re (2098 in 4:02-md-01486-PJH) Stipulation, filed by Petro Computer Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/29/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
December 3, 2008 479 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING THE DECEMBER 5, 2008 DISCOVERY CONFERENCE re (478 in 3:06-cv-04333-PJH)(1932 in M:02-1486 PJH) Stipulation, filed by Hynix Semiconductor, Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America, Inc. Discovery Hearing continued to 1/9/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Updated jt discovery status conference statement due 1/5/9. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/3/8. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
October 28, 2008 475 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting re 474 Stipulation To Extend Time To Answer Interrogatories (Ext. to 11/7/08) filed by The State of North Carolina by its Attorney General Roy Cooper. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/28/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 6, 2008 472 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER INTERROGATORIES. Signed by Hon. Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/6/2008. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 2, 2008 468 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting re (467 in 3:06-cv-04333-PJH) Joint Stipulation To Extend Time to Answer Interrogatories filed by The State of Rhode Island by Patrick C. Lynch in his Capacity as Attorney General. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/2/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
September 11, 2008 456 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 423 Motion to Strike (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)
September 8, 2008 450 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Following September 5, 2008 Discovery Conference. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/8/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 5, 2008 448 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Denying 359 Class Certification (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
August 4, 2006 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2006 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/4/06. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The State of California by its Attorney General Bill Lockyer and the City and County of San Francisco Ex Rel Dennis J. Herrera and the Los Angeles Unified School District on Behalf of all other Politi et al v. Infineon Technologies AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?