Securities And Exchange Commission v. Reyes et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv04435
Filed: July 21, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2011 462 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF INMATE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/24/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
February 18, 2011 459 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SETTING Further Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on February 18, 2011. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 4, 2011 457 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing hearing re 451 Stipulation filed by Gregory L. Reyes, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 445 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment against Defendant Gregory L. Reyes. Responses due by 2/4/2011. Replies due by 2/25/2011. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/3/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
April 6, 2009 436 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Securities And Exchange Commission against Antonio Canova in the amount of $249,351. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/3/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009) Modified on 4/7/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities And Exchange Commission v. Reyes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?