Medtronic Inc. et al v. W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc.

Case Number: 3:2006cv04455
Filed: July 21, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Referring Judge: James Larson
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2009 580 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/4/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
August 24, 2009 573 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 571 STIPULATION TO VACATE TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/24/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
August 19, 2009 569 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PERMITTING ENTRY TO THE COURT with Equipment. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/19/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 18, 2009 565 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Gore's Motion in Limine No. 5. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 18, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 17, 2009 562 Opinion or Order of the Court COURT'S INTENDED VOIR DIRE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 17, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 11, 2009 542 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RULING ON REMAINDER OF MOTIONS TO SEAL: 481 MOTION to Seal Document 461 MOTION to Seal Document 469 MOTION to Seal Document 412 MOTION to Seal Document 484 MOTION to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/11/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
July 17, 2009 401 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING IN PART 394 Motion to Shorten Time. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
July 15, 2009 396 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Referral for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 15, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
July 9, 2009 374 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 367 Motion to Seal Document. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
June 11, 2009 364 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN-PART GORE'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMIT FOR ITS DAUBERT MOTION IN LIMINE AND FOR A REPLY BRIEF AND ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/11/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
April 28, 2009 352 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART 350 STIPULATION REQUESTING APPROVAL FOR DIRECT SETTLEMENT MEETING BETWEEN THE PARTIES INSTEAD OF AN ADDITIONAL THIRD-PARTY MEDIATION SESSION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/28/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
April 7, 2009 344 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 342 MOTION to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/7/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
March 25, 2009 338 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 335 Stipulation to Extend Deadline on Proposal re Indefiniteness. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 25, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 13, 2009 326 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 312 Motion to Seal. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
February 17, 2009 315 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONSTRUE ADDITIONAL TERM. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/17/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009) Modified on 2/17/2009 (jjo, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2008 308 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 218 Motion to Bifurcate. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
September 24, 2008 301 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 298 Motion to Seal. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
September 16, 2008 295 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENT SUBMITTED AT SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING AS MODIFIED HEREIN; re 292 MOTION to Seal Document PURSUANT TO CIV. L.R. 79-5(b) DOCUMENT SUBMITTED AT SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING filed by Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic Vascular, Inc., Medtronic Inc. Signed by Hon. Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/16/2008. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
September 15, 2008 291 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 285 Motion for Leave to File Post Hearing Submission. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 11, 2008 281 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 11, 2008. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)
September 9, 2008 279 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 277 Request for Entry And Exit To The Court With Equipment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/9/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008) Modified on 9/9/2008 (jjo, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medtronic Inc. et al v. W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?