Washington v. Ollison

Case Number: 3:2006cv04490
Filed: July 24, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Appointment and Authority to pay court appointed counsel on Appeal (John J. Jordan, esq.). Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/26/10. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
November 3, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 68 Certificate of Appealability. The clerk shall process the appeal. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/3/09. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
September 23, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The petition for writ of habeas corpus is denied. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Ollison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?