Carpinelli et al v. Boliden AB et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv04528
Filed: July 25, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/29/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 22, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/22/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
January 29, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Overdue Status Report. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 29, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
November 25, 2008 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORTS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/25/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpinelli et al v. Boliden AB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?