Truck Insurance Exchange v. Atlantic Mutual Insurance Company

Case Number: 3:2006cv04573
Filed: July 27, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Insurance Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Referring Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2009 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/17/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
April 13, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re list of pending federal cases. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/13/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 1, 2009 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HOW THE COURT HAS SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/1/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
March 25, 2009 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying in part 77 Ex Parte Application.Truck may supplement its opposition. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 13, 2009 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 75 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Truck Insurance Exchange, Attorney David W. Evans; Robert Nathan Schiff; Lorraine A. Barrabee and Scott Michael Bloom terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/13/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
February 23, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING DISCOVERY HEARING re 38 Letter filed by Truck Insurance Exchange. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/23/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 9, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 60 Stipulation filed by Truck Insurance Exchange, ORDER REOPENING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/6/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Truck Insurance Exchange v. Atlantic Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?