Gerstein v. Central Intelligence Agency et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv04643
Filed: July 31, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2011 158 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Judgment is partially awarded to plaintiff regarding the expedited processing of records responsive to his requests by certain defendants;Judgment is ordered in favor of defendants with respect to the responses to plaintiff's FOIA requests. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/7/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
January 21, 2011 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/21/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 11, 2011 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS THIRD RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING PLAINTIFFS SECOND RENEWED CROSS-MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; VACATING HEARING. Order granting 149 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 150 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
November 16, 2010 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS ON PARTIES' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The Court continues the hearings on defendant's motion and plaintiff's cross-motion to January 14, 2011, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/16/2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
October 25, 2010 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' BRIEFING DEADLINE FOR FILING RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Defendants' renewed motion for summary judgment is due no later than October 22, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/25/10. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
September 17, 2010 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S SECOND RENEWED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 17, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
August 11, 2010 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING. The parties' stipulation to continue the scheduled hearing on the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment from August 27, 2010 to October 8, is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 11, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
July 8, 2010 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE MOTION HEARING DATES TO JULY 30, 2010. The parties' stipulation to consolidate the hearing dates for the cross-motions for summary judgment pending before the Court to July 30, 2010 is granted, and the July 9, 2010 hearing date is vacated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer for Maxine M. Chesney on July 8, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010) Modified on 7/8/2010.
May 7, 2010 135 Opinion or Order of the Court THIRD STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' BRIEFING DEADLINE FOR FILING RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF. Deadline extended to May 21, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 7, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
April 22, 2010 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' BRIEFING DEADLINE FOR FILING RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF. Deadline extended to May 7, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 22, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
March 26, 2010 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' BRIEFING DEADLINE FOR FILING RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Extending deadline to April 23, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 26, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
February 23, 2010 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN PART 107 DEFENDANTS' RENEWED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING 110 , 112 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING 111 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO MODIFY STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN PENDING CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 23, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
October 14, 2009 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION 126 ; VACATING OCTOBER 16, 2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The case management conference shall be rescheduled by the Court, as necessary, following the Court's ruling on the pending motions. A joint case management conference statement shall be due one week before the next scheduled conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 14, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
May 18, 2009 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to August 7, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 18, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
March 17, 2009 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING MARCH 20, 2009 HEARINGS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 17, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
March 3, 2009 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference scheduled for March 6, 2009 is continued to May 22, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 3, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
February 20, 2009 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' BRIEFING DEADLINE FOR FILING REPLY IN SUPPORT OF RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Defendants' reply shall be filed no later than February 27, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 20, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
January 6, 2009 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANTS' RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Plaintiff's opposition shall be filed no later than February 6, 2009. Defendants' reply shall be filed no later than February 20, 2009. The hearing on the motion shall be on March 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 6, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
December 5, 2008 106 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' BRIEFING DEADLINE FOR RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Defendants' renewed motion for summary judgment is due no later than January 5, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 5, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
November 18, 2008 104 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' BRIEFING DEADLINE FOR RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Defendants' renewed motion for summary judgment is due no later than December 5, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
October 10, 2008 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN PENDING CLAIMS; ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to March 6, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 10, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
September 26, 2008 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 51 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING 61 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING 62 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT; DENYING 63 WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW AND LIMITED DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 26, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
February 7, 2008 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERENCE; SETTING HEARING. The reference to Judge Nielsen is withdrawn. Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Department of Justice, pla intiff's Motion for More Definite Statement from Defendant NSA Regarding Scope of Search, and plaintiff's Motion for In Camera Review and Limited Discovery are set for hearing on April 4, 2008 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 7, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerstein v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?