v. Presidio Trust Facilities Division/Residential Management Branch

Case Number: 3:2006cv04667
Filed: July 31, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2010 75 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on March 31, 2010. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
February 19, 2010 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to continue hearing re 69 Stipulation filed by Presidio Trust Facilities Division/Residential Management Branch, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 54 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/18/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
November 23, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/23/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
September 17, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 48 Stipulation filed by Presidio Trust Facilities Divisioto continue CMC/Residential Management Branch Further Case Management Conference continued to 10/2/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/17/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. Presidio Trust Facilities Division/Residential Management Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?