Bussing v. Schwartz et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv04669
Filed: August 1, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2011 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STATISTICALLY CLOSING ACTION PENDING OTHER PROCEEDINGS; Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 7/15/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
January 7, 2009 102 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re 101 Stipulation filed by Andrew Anthony Allison. The hearing on any motion to dismiss will be on May 26, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on January 7, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
November 25, 2008 100 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DATE for Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint to 1/09/2009 re 99 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/25/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 12, 2008 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part 75 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 76 Motion to Dismiss (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
October 7, 2008 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 94 Letter filed by Asyst Technologies, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 7, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bussing v. Schwartz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?