Espinosa et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv04686
Filed: August 2, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2014 429 Opinion or Order of the Court Court's Intended Special Verdict Form. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 2, 2014. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
August 28, 2014 392 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FURNISH DAILY REFRESHMENTS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/28/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 4, 2014 369 Opinion or Order of the Court COURT'S INTENDED FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/4/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
July 29, 2014 365 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 29, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
February 4, 2014 355 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 354 MOTION to Continue FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/4/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
December 2, 2013 353 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 351 STIPULATION CONTINUING TRIAL DATE. Jury Selection set for 9/8/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 9/8/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/2/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
October 30, 2013 347 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 3/10/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 3/10/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/30/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
September 20, 2013 335 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXCUSING OFFICER PAULO MORGADO FROM ATTENDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON 9/25/13 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/20/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
February 21, 2013 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 217 MOTION to Continue Trial Date. (The Pretrial Conference date of April 1, 2013 remains as scheduled.) Jury Selection set for 12/2/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 12/2/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/21/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
July 2, 2012 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge Kandis Westmore on 7/2/12. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 27, 2012 213 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 212 STIPULATION TO EXTEND LIMITED FACT DISCOVERY and REFERRING ALL DISCOVERY TO A RANDOMLY ASSIGNED MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/27/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
April 25, 2012 210 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED SECOND ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/25/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 19, 2012 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/19/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
January 31, 2012 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING 1) FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND 2) ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION DEADLINE. Case Management Statement due by 4/6/2012. Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/31/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
September 17, 2008 183 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO VACATE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES. Signed by Hon. Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/17/2008. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinosa et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?