Simpson v. McNack et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv04837
Filed: August 10, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2010 208 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal re 207 Stipulation filed by Gordon Simpson. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/12/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
July 26, 2010 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 205 Notice of Withdrawal of Motions #184, 193 and 196 filed by Stanley A. Nguyen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/26/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 22, 2010 204 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING JURY VERDICT, JUDGMENT AND SPECIAL VERDICT FINDINGS FROM TRIAL re 203 Stipulation filed by Stanley A. Nguyen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/22/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
May 27, 2010 188 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO MOVE AND/OR APPLY FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS re 187 Stipulation filed by Gordon Simpson. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/27/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 13, 2010 177 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 12, 2010 175 Opinion or Order of the Court COURT'S PROPOSED VERDICT FORM (May 12, 2010). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 11, 2010 173 Opinion or Order of the Court JURY INSTRUCTIONS (May 11, 2010). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 10, 2010 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Re 155 168 Defendants' Motions in Limine and 169 Defendants' Objections to Plaintiff's Exhibits. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
April 30, 2010 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING JURY COMMISSIONER TO FURNISH DAILY REFRESHMENTS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/30/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
February 12, 2010 140 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFS. McNACK, ZENDEJAS AND BART ONLY re 139 Stipulation filed by Zendejas, Bay Area Rapid Transit District, A. McNack. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/12/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
January 4, 2010 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/4/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
November 18, 2009 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING LIMITED SCOPE COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/18/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
November 12, 2009 126 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 125 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (page 2 paragraph 3 changed from 2009 to 2010). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/12/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 6, 2009 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 109 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
May 29, 2009 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 90 Plaintiff's Attorney's Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Daniel Ralph Richardson terminated effective 6/26/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009) Modified on 5/29/2009 (emcsec, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Sealing Plaintiff's Response to Counsel's Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/27/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
October 3, 2008 78 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 76 Stipulation filed by Zendejas, Bay Area Rapid Transit District, A. McNack. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/3/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. McNack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?