Center for Biological Diversity et al v. U.S. Bureau of Land Management et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv04884
Filed: August 14, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Environmental Matters Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2016 395 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Video Status Conference set for 6/7/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/18/2016. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
June 25, 2015 387 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: NON-PARTY FILINGS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
March 31, 2014 376 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas denying 338 Motion for enforcement of remedies order; granting 346 Motion for modification of remedies order; denying 360 Motion for enforcement of remedies order. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
December 9, 2013 359 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 358 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
September 17, 2013 350 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Motions Hearing set for 11/21/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom D, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas on 9/17/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
July 21, 2013 335 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 334 . Telephonic Status Conference continued to 8/13/2013 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 7/19/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2013)
October 31, 2012 326 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER following special status conference to address enforcement of remedies order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas 10/31/12. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
June 21, 2012 310 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 307 Brief,, filed by California Native Plant Society, Friends of Juniper Flats, Western San Bernardino County Landowners Association, The Wilderness Society, Alliance for Responsible Recreation, Community ORV Watch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on June 21, 2012. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 5, 2012 309 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Parties to Meet and Confer and Setting Special Status Conference. Status Conference set for 7/18/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas.. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 6/5/12. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
January 30, 2012 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
December 7, 2011 295 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
October 25, 2011 288 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: Stipulation on Attorneys' Fees and Costs -- (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
September 28, 2011 281 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: in favor of plaintiffs and against defendants. The Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the January 29, 2011 order and to hear any motion for attorneys' fees. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011) Modified on 9/29/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2011 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
May 2, 2011 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting request to extend deadline re: Fees and Costs (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
March 22, 2011 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting request to file request for attorneys' fees and costs re 245 Stipulation. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011) Modified on 3/23/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2011 244 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2011)
July 9, 2010 234 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR SITE VISIT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
June 25, 2010 225 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR RESPONSE RE: FEDERAL DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR A SITE VISIT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
January 20, 2010 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERRAL FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
September 28, 2009 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS [159-161]. Case Management Conference is set for 10/30/09 at 3:00 p.m..(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity et al v. U.S. Bureau of Land Management et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?