Freeman v. Barnhart et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv04900
Filed: August 14, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 18, 2009 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying 196 Motion for New Trial (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
January 7, 2009 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 194 Stipulation extending time for plaintiff's objections to Defendant's Bil of Costs. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/7/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
December 15, 2008 177 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Proposed Final Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 15, 2008. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 12, 2008 175 Opinion or Order of the Court Court's Proposed Special Verdict Form. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 12, 2008. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 5, 2008 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Objections to Redacted Exhibits. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 5, 2008. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 3, 2008 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Ruling on Objections to Deposition Excerpts. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 3, 2008. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
December 2, 2008 154 Opinion or Order of the Court COURT'S INTENDED VOIR DIRE FOR PANEL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/2/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
December 1, 2008 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 145 Motion for Leave to File (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
November 25, 2008 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Pretrial Issues. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 25, 2008. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
October 31, 2008 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 127 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Settlement Conference set for 11/18/2008 10:00 AM.. Signed by HON. MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 10/31/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Barnhart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?