Runge v. Ippollito et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv05218
Filed: August 24, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2010 155 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum issued for Plaintiff's appearance at Solano State Prison November 18, 2010. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/20/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 13, 2010 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 152 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Cory Dean Runge. Signed by Judge Vadas on October 13, 2010. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
May 3, 2010 146 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum issued for Plaintiff's appearance at June 7, 2010 settlement conference. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/3/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
March 26, 2010 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: granting defendant Rincon's motion for summary judgment as to plaintiff's claim for damages for excessive force and as to plaintiff's First Amendment retaliation claim, denied as to plaintiff's claim for nominal and punitiv e damages for excessive force 94 , granting Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defendant Armstrong and denying Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defendant Major 97 , granting Motion for Summary Judgment by defendant Sanchez 132 . Case referre d to Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas for possible settlement pursuant to the Pro Se Prisoner Mediation Program. Further proceedings in this case are STAYED until such time as Judge Vadas reports that the case has been settled or cannot be settled. Order signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/26/2010. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Runge v. Ippollito et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?