Bretches v. Kirkland

Case Number: 3:2006cv05277
Filed: August 28, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2012 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 136 STIPULATION for Voluntary Dismissal w/ Prejudice. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/22/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
February 24, 2012 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TERMINATING: 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 100 First MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment IN LIGHT OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/24/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
December 20, 2011 133 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding Status Conference set for 1/31/2012 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas.. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 12/20/11. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
November 29, 2011 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 130 Stipulation and SETTING Settlement Conference for December 16, 2011. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 29, 2011. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
April 22, 2011 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE VADAS FOR SECOND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/22/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 18, 2011 115 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice of Questions for Hearing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/18/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
March 2, 2011 94 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND DENYING ORDER TO EXTEND LENGTH OF OPENING BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/2/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
January 3, 2011 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 89 Stipulation REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/3/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
August 12, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SCREENING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/12/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
January 21, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; case did not settle. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 1/20/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
December 22, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 66 Motion to Dismiss and GRANTING 70 Motion to File Amended Complaint. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
November 30, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 77 Stipulation to Continue Completion Period for Mandatory Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/30/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
October 21, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFF'W MOTION TO FILE UNTIMELY COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/21/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
September 11, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/11/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 11, 2006 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re reassignment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/11/06. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2006) Modified on 9/15/2006 (mcl, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bretches v. Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?