PAI Corporation v. Integrated Science Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv05349
Filed: August 30, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2015 347 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 346 Notice and Request that the Court No Longer Retain Jurisdiction filed by Integrated Science Solutions, Inc., Cecelia McCloy. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/15/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
May 13, 2015 345 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED REDACTED ORDER GRANTING re 319 MOTION FOR JUDICIAL RELIEF FOR PLAINTIFFS BREACH OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT filed by Integrated Science Solutions, Inc., Cecelia McCloy. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 04/07/2015. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
April 7, 2015 340 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER To FILE UNDER SEAL 339 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief for Plaintiff's Breach of Settlement Agreement. Parties shall submit proposed redactions within 21 days. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on April 7, 2015. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
February 10, 2010 312 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 02/10/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
October 7, 2009 297 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/09/9. Status Conference Re: Appeal re-set for 11/6/2009 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/7/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
September 17, 2009 295 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER To Continue Status Conference prev. set for 9/18/9 at 1:30 PM has been re-set for 10/9/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 09/17/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
April 23, 2009 280 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 226 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; granting in part and denying in part 228 Motion for New Trial (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
March 19, 2009 274 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR THE RELEASE OF ALL FUNDS HELD PURSUANT TO WRIT OF EXECUTION. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/19/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 5, 2009 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING TEMPORARY STAY OF ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT [Re: Docket No. 253] Second Ex Parte Application for Stay of Enforcement of Judgment Pending Determination of Defendants' Motion for New Trial and Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by David C. Dobson, Integrated Science Solutions, Inc., Cecelia McCloy. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 03/05/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
February 25, 2009 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero Granting in Part and Denying in Part 253 Ex Parte Application for Stay (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 18, 2009 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STAY OF ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 18, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
December 11, 2008 232 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEYS. Ann A. Nguyen substitutes in as counsel of record for Plaintiff Pai. Attorney Q. Huy Do terminated.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/11/08. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
November 17, 2008 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION DEADLIN FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE POST-TRIAL MOTIONS. Defendants to file any post-trial motions is extended to December 1, 2008. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/17/08. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
October 29, 2008 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero of Special Verdict Form (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 28, 2008 204 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Supplemental Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 28, 2008. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 27, 2008 196 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 27, 2008. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 7, 2008 161 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Hon. Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/7/2008. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 6, 2008 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Jury Commissioner To Furnish Daily Refershments. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/3/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAI Corporation v. Integrated Science Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?